Howe et al v. Allergan Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elmer Lee Howe, Jr. and Karon Howe
Defendant: Allergan Inc., Allergan USA, Inc. and Allergan PLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00037
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Acknowledged receipt of electronically transferred case by USDC District of New Jersey, their civil action no. 2:20-cv-03785. (rth)
April 7, 2020 Case electronically transferred to District of New Jersey. Original electronic file and docket sheet sent. (tmg)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 Transfer Order of Judicial Panel MDL transferring case to District of New Jersey, MDL# 2921 (CTO-7). Matter transferred for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Clerk of the Panel, John W. Nichols. (tmg)
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Allergan PLC on 03/20/2020 by Elmer Lee Howe, Jr, Karon Howe. (Hurst, John)
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Allergan USA, Inc. on 03/20/2020 by Elmer Lee Howe, Jr, Karon Howe. (Hurst, John)
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Allergan inc. f/k/a Inamed Corp. f/ka McGhan Medical Corp. on 03/20/2020 by Elmer Lee Howe, Jr, Karon Howe. (Hurst, John)
March 20, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (tmg)
March 20, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allergan Inc., Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4430887), filed by Karon Howe, Elmer Lee Howe, Jr.(Hurst, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howe et al v. Allergan Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmer Lee Howe, Jr.
Represented By: John David Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karon Howe
Represented By: John David Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?