Randolph v. Saul
Plaintiff: Carolyn S. Randolph
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 5:2020cv00094
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney General served on 8/3/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(brl)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/28/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(brl)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney General served on 7/24/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (brl)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Andrew M. Saul, US Attorney and US Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM 285)(nvc)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (Sealed - Participants) granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 7/23/2020. (nvc)
July 17, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carolyn S. Randolph. (Clauson, Vaughn)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Carolyn S. Randolph.(Clauson, Vaughn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randolph v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn S. Randolph
Represented By: Vaughn Stephen Clauson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?