Ricks et al v. Lowes Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Pennington and Gregory Ricks
Defendant: Lowe's Companies Inc and Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00111
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Statesville Office
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David S Cayer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2 (a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT of Member Cases: 5:20-cv-00041, 5:20-cv-00104, 5:20-cv-00105, 5:20-cv-00106, 5:20-cv-00107, 5:20-cv-00108, 5:20-cv-00109, 5:20-cv-00110, 5:20-cv-00111, 5:20-cv-00112, 5:20-cv-00113, 5:20-cv-00114, 5:20-cv-00115, 5:20-cv-00118, 5:20-cv-00119, 5:20-cv-00120, 5:20-cv-00121, 5:20-cv-00122, 5:20-cv-00123. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 8/12/2020. (tmg)
August 7, 2020 Filing 30 Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:20-cv-00515. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
August 7, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg)
August 5, 2020 Filing 29 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER transferring case to the Western District of North Carolina. Signed by MDL on 8/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 28 MDL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Western District of North Carolina. Signed by MDL on 8/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Minute Order) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Naima Farrell and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jordan T. Smith (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6023768) by Defendants Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Smith, Jordan) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Karl G. Nelson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jordan T. Smith (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6022494) by Defendants Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Smith, Jordan) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David Schnitzer and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jordan T. Smith (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6022491) by Defendants Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Smith, Jordan) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jason C. Schwartz and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jordan T. Smith (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6022478) by Defendants Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Smith, Jordan) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Molly T. Senger and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jordan T. Smith (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6022464) by Defendants Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Smith, Jordan) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Matt Gregory and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jordan T. Smith (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6022433) by Defendants Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Smith, Jordan) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #17 Stipulation to Stay Deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elaina S. Bailey for Gregory Ricks and Stephanie Pennington and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/27/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kevin J Stoops for Gregory Ricks and Stephanie Pennington and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/27/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
May 17, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jason C. Schwartz; Molly T. Senger; David A. Schnitzer; Naima L. Farrell; Karl G. Nelson; Paul J. Peralta to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 5/31/2020. (no image attached) (MMM) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION to Stay Deadlines by Defendants Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Smith, Jordan) Modified text on 5/17/2020 (MMM). [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Smith, Jordan) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jordan T. Smith on behalf of Defendants Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Smith, Jordan) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #11 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Elaina S. Bailey re 12 Minute Order,,, by Plaintiffs Stephanie Pennington, Gregory Ricks. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Springmeyer, Don) Modified on 4/2/2020 (MMM). [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kevin J. Stoops re 12 Minute Order,,, by Plaintiffs Stephanie Pennington, Gregory Ricks. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Springmeyer, Don) Modified on 4/2/2020 (MMM). [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/25/2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a ruling on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and Designation of Local Counsel #11 and 12 are DEFERRED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner Kevin J. Stoops and Elaina S. Bailey shall have the document signed by an active commissioned Notary Public (stamp) in order to have this Court consider the Verified Petition For Permission To Practice In This Case Only By Attorney Not Admitted To The Bar Of This Court And Designation Of Local Counsel. Petitioners shall have 14 days from the entry of this order to file corrected Verified Petitions using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. Failure to timely remedy this deficiency will result in the denial of the Verified Petitions, and Petitioners will be required to refile and to repay the filing fee.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 11 VIEW #14 corrected image to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Elaina S. Bailey and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5939707) by Plaintiffs Stephanie Pennington, Gregory Ricks. (Springmeyer, Don) Modified on 4/2/2020 (MMM). [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 10 VIEW #13 corrected image to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kevin J. Stoops and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 (Receipt #0978-5939529) by Plaintiffs Stephanie Pennington, Gregory Ricks. (EDS) Modified on 4/2/2020 (MMM). [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gregory Ricks, Stephanie Pennington re #7 Summons Issued. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC waiver sent on 3/20/2020, answer due 5/19/2020. (Springmeyer, Don) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gregory Ricks, Stephanie Pennington re #7 Summons Issued. Lowe's Companies, Inc. waiver sent on 3/20/2020, answer due 5/19/2020. (Springmeyer, Don) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Lowe's Companies, Inc. and Lowe's Home Centers, LLC by Plaintiffs Stephanie Pennington, Gregory Ricks. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Springmeyer, Don) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Stephanie Pennington, Gregory Ricks. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Springmeyer, Don) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Complaint by Plaintiffs Stephanie Pennington, Gregory Ricks. (Springmeyer, Don) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Kevin J Stoops and Elaina S. Bailey to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 4/27/2020. (no image attached) (MR) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400) by Gregory Ricks, Stephanie Pennington. Proof of service due by 6/10/2020. (MR) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR) [Transferred from Nevada on 8/7/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricks et al v. Lowes Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Companies Inc
Represented By: Molly Trustman Senger
Represented By: Karl G. Nelson
Represented By: Paul Javier Peralta
Represented By: Jason Craig Schwartz
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Represented By: Naima Lillian Farrell
Represented By: David A. Schnitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Molly Trustman Senger
Represented By: Karl G. Nelson
Represented By: Paul Javier Peralta
Represented By: Jason Craig Schwartz
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Represented By: Naima Lillian Farrell
Represented By: David A. Schnitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Pennington
Represented By: Elaina S Bailey
Represented By: Daniel Bravo
Represented By: Angela Jill Guingcangco
Represented By: Don Springmeyer
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Ricks
Represented By: Elaina S Bailey
Represented By: Daniel Bravo
Represented By: Angela Jill Guingcangco
Represented By: Don Springmeyer
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?