Luffman v. Saul
Plaintiff: Linda S. Luffman
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 5:2020cv00128
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Andrew M. Saul. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (McWilliams, LaNita). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by LaNita McWilliams on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (McWilliams, LaNita)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Linda S. Luffman. Andrew M. Saul served on 8/29/2020, answer due 10/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 proof of service)(Patton, Amelia)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY Order of Referral - Social Security. Pursuant to the Standing Order 3:13MC95, 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and Local Civil Rule 72.1 this case is referred to a United States Magistrate Judge to make findings of fact, conclusions of law and to recommend disposition of any dispositive motion filed through submission of a Memorandum and Recommendation to the District Judge. Case referred to Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Entered by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/1/2020. (khm)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Andrew M. Saul, US Attorney and US Attorney General. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (nvc). Modified on 8/25/2020 (nvc).
August 18, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(nvc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 04194626146), filed by Linda S Luffman.(Patton, Amelia) Modified text on 8/18/2020 (nvc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luffman v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda S. Luffman
Represented By: Amelia N. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: LaNita McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?