Groves et al v. Oakes et al
Plaintiff: Marie Groves and Abraham Groves
Defendant: Grange Insurance Company and Ashley Scott Oakes
Case Number: 5:2020cv00132
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David S Cayer
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 11/12/2020. (nvc)
October 21, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Ashley Scott Oakes.(Stein, Gerald)
October 15, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grange Insurance Company (Connor, Heather)
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Grange Insurance Company.(Connor, Heather)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Graham Connor on behalf of Grange Insurance Company (Connor, Heather)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Marie Groves, Abraham Groves.(Connette, Edward)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiffs shall file their amended complaint within five days of this Order. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/13/2020. (DLG)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Abraham Groves, Marie Groves. Responses due by 10/27/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint) (Connette, Edward). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Certificate of Settlement Conference Pursuant to Standing Order 5:19-mc-5. Result: Unable to resolve by Ashley Scott Oakes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Stein, Gerald) Modified text on 10/6/2020 (nvc).
October 1, 2020 Reset Deadline: Certificate of Settlement Conference due by 10/30/2020. (mek)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time for Certificate of Settlement Conference. Parties have until 10/30/2020 to sign the Certificate of Settlement Conference. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/30/2020. (KCA)
September 30, 2020 Motion referred to David S. Cayer.: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time (nvc)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time for Certificate of Settlement Conference by Ashley Scott Oakes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Pre-Trial Settlement Conference)(Stein, Gerald). Motion referred to David S. Cayer. Modified text / referral on 9/30/2020 (nvc).
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ashley Scott Oakes.(Stein, Gerald)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Marie Groves, Abraham Groves. Grange Insurance Company served on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Connette, Edward)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Marie Groves, Abraham Groves. Ashley Scott Oakes served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Connette, Edward)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Grange Insurance Company Summons)(nvc)
August 27, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (nvc)
August 27, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(nvc)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4641993), filed by Marie Groves, Abraham Groves.(Connette, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Groves et al v. Oakes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grange Insurance Company
Represented By: Heather Graham Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Scott Oakes
Represented By: Gerald Anderson Stein, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Groves
Represented By: Edward G. Connette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Groves
Represented By: Edward G. Connette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?