Sarlo et al v. Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lory Sarlo and Michael Sarlo
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00140
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David S Cayer
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/25/2021 (nvc)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER STAYING CASE pursuant to #4 Suggestion of Bankruptcy. Parties shall file a status report with the Court (90) days until the bankruptcy proceeding is completed or the automatic stay is lifted, whichever comes first. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 10/23/20. (nvc)
October 20, 2020 Filing 4 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (Anderson, Lucy)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ruby Tuesday, Inc.'s answer due 10/20/2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/6/2020. (DLG)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Anderson, Lucy). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tmg)
September 9, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (tmg)
September 9, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ruby Tuesday, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4655778), filed by Michael Sarlo, Lory Sarlo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Paris, Bryant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarlo et al v. Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lory Sarlo
Represented By: Bryant Duke Paris, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sarlo
Represented By: Bryant Duke Paris, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Represented By: Lucy Meryl Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?