McRae v. Niagara Bottling
Plaintiff: Judameyre McRae and Judameyre L. McRae
Defendant: Niagara Bottling, Melanie Calkins and Greg Banks
Case Number: 5:2020cv00149
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Original Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit re: #11 Notice of Appeal [20-2065]. (hms)
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 USCA Case Number 20-2065 for #11 Notice of Appeal USCA Case Manager: Joy Hargett Moore. (hms)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #11 Notice of Appeal (tmg)
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Order, #8 Clerk's Judgment by Judameyre L. McRae. (IFP) (tmg)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Niagara Bottling filed by Judameyre L. McRae. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Defamation Claim) (tmg)
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Judameyre L. McRae (tmg)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 10/5/2020. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Plaintiff's Complaint [Docs. 1, 5, 6] is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED for the limited purpose of initial review. The Clerk is instructed to docket Plaintiff's Amended Complaint [Doc. 5] and Plaintiff's Letter/Motion [Doc. 6], as Addendums to Plaintiff's original Complaint to be docketed at Docket Entry Nos. 1-2 and 1-3. The Clerk is further instructed to terminate the motion associated with Docket Entry No. 6 and to add Melanie Calkins and Greg Banks as Defendants in this matter. The Clerk is further instructed to terminate this action. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 10/3/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION/LETTER to Add Names and Remove #5 Amended Complaint by Judameyre L. McRae. (tmg). Motions referred to David Keesler. Modified on 10/2/2020 (tmg).
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Niagara Bottling filed by Judameyre L. McRae. (Citing N.C.G.S.14-48 and 28 USC 4101) (tmg)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 Pro Se REQUEST for Jury Trial by Judameyre L. McRae re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(eef)
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Judameyre L. McRae. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (eef)
September 18, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The order was served conventionally. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (tmg)
September 18, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Case Assignment Packet. The document was served conventionally by US Mail (tmg)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. The filing fee of $400.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Application or Fee due by 10/9/2020. (tmg)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Niagara Bottling (Filing fee - Unpaid) filed by Judameyre McRae. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McRae v. Niagara Bottling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niagara Bottling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Calkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judameyre McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judameyre L. McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?