Meadows v. Saul
Plaintiff: Sandra Presnell Meadows
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 5:2020cv00155
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Andrew M. Saul. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (McWilliams, LaNita)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by LaNita McWilliams on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (McWilliams, LaNita)
October 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David Chermol Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4731468. by Sandra Presnell Meadows. (Hall, Charles)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Andrew M. Saul, US Attorney and US Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Forms) (tmg)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (Sealed - Participants) granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk shall issue summons to US Marshal for service. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 10/6/2020. (tmg)
September 28, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr. . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg) Modified text on 9/28/2020 (tmg).
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sandra Presnell Meadows. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hall, Charles)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Sandra Presnell Meadows. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Hall, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meadows v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: LaNita McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Presnell Meadows
Represented By: Charles Frederick Hall, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?