Pratt v. Robbins et al
Plaintiff: Frederick Pratt
Defendant: John Hernandez, Stephanie Miller, John Robbins and John Delozier
Case Number: 5:2020cv00170
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Statesville Office
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to NC Department of Public Safety on 12/8/2020 as to defendants John Delozier, Stephanie Miller, John Robbins. Waiver of Service due by 2/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Waivers) (khm)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that all claims asserted in this matter as to all Defendants are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim, with the exception of the Eighth Amendment claim against Defendants Robbins, Delozier, and Miller, which is allowed to pass initial review. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant John Hernandez is hereby DISMISSED as a Defendant in this matter for failure to state a claim. The Clerk of Court shall commence the procedure for waiver of service as set forth in Local Civil Rule 4.3 for Defendants Robbins, Delozier, and Miller, who are alleged to be current or former employees of NCDPS. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/7/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (khm)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Waiving Initial Partial Filing Fee and Directing Monthly Payments be Made from Prison Account of Frederick Pratt. Directing correctional facility to transmit payments. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 11/06/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(hms)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) (nvc)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. Signed by Clerk of Court on 10/21/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(reh)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Instructions to Plaintiff pursuant to Standing Order 3:19-mc-54 (Pro se litigant served by US Mail) (tmg)
October 19, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by Frederick Pratt (Attachments: #1 Trust Fund Statement, #2 Envelope) (tmg)
October 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Delozier, John Hernandez, Stephanie Miller, John Robbins filed by Frederick Pratt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Envelope) (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pratt v. Robbins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Delozier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?