R.A v. Iredell-Statesville School District Board of Education
Plaintiff: G.A. and R.A.
Defendant: Iredell-Statesville School District Board of Education, Alvera Lesane, Robin Johnson, Andrew Mehall, Rhonda McClenahan, Brady Johnson and Alisha Cloer
Case Number: 5:2020cv00192
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David S Cayer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1400
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Alvera Lesane on 02/03/2021 by R.A.. (Gahagan, Stacey)
February 3, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Robin Johnson on 02/03/2021 by R.A.. (Gahagan, Stacey)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Rhonda McClenahan on 02/03/2021 by R.A.. (Gahagan, Stacey)
February 3, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Brady Johnson on 02/03/2021 by R.A.. (Gahagan, Stacey)
February 3, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Andrew Mehall on 02/03/2021 by R.A.. (Gahagan, Stacey)
February 3, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Alisha Cloer on 02/03/2021 by R.A.. (Gahagan, Stacey)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by R.A..(Gahagan, Stacey)
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Iredell-Statesville School District Board of Education. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (nvc)
December 14, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(nvc)
December 14, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (nvc)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Iredell-Statesville School District Board of Education with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-4801136), filed by C.G.A., R.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Summons)(Gahagan, Stacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R.A v. Iredell-Statesville School District Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.A.
Represented By: Stacey Marlise Gahagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.A.
Represented By: Stacey Marlise Gahagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iredell-Statesville School District Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvera Lesane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Mehall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda McClenahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brady Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alisha Cloer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?