Berry v. United States Department of Treasury
Plaintiff: Duane L. Berry
Defendant: United States Department of Treasury
Case Number: 5:2021cv00029
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Filing 15 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 4/8/2021. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice for failure to pay a filing fee or file the appropriate application to proceed without prepayment of fees and for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 4/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Northern District of Texas Order) (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
April 7, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Submittal of Warrant for Arrest In Rem with USM 285 form by and through Federal Trustee, Duane L. Berry (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tmg)
April 7, 2021 Filing 12 Addendum through Federal Trustee, Duane L. Berry. Addendum to #4 Motion to Correct Caption and/or Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tmg)
March 31, 2021 Filing 11 USCA Case Number 21-6497 for #9 Notice of Appeal USCA Case Manager: Anisha Walker. (rhf)
March 30, 2021 Filing 10 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #9 Notice of Appeal (tmg)
March 30, 2021 Original Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit re: #9 Notice of Appeal. (tmg)
March 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Order by Federal Trustee, Duane L. Berry. (Filing Fee - Unpaid) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (tmg)
March 29, 2021 Filing 8 Addendum through Federal Trustee, Duane L. Berry. Addendum to #4 Motion to Correct Caption and/or Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tmg)
March 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing re: Copy of Complaint (Document No. 1) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tmg)
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Submittal of Proposed Order and Warrant for Arrest In Rem by and through Federal Trustee, Duane L. Berry (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tmg)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Plaintiff shall have 14 days from the date of this Order in which to pay the filing fee or file an application to proceed without prepaying the fee. If Plaintiff fails to do so, this case shall be dismissed without prejudice and closed without further notice to the Plaintiff. (Fee due by 4/2/2021.)Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 3/19/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(nvc)
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Correct Caption and or Jurisdiction by Duane L. Berry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Warrant for Arrest in Rem, #2 Envelope) (tmg). Motions referred to David Keesler.
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Federal Trustee Duane L. Berry (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tmg)
February 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. The filing fee of $402.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Application or Fee due by 3/15/2021. (nvc)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Treasury, filed by Duane L. Berry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(nvc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. United States Department of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane L. Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?