Parsons v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Latiesha Parsons
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00035
Filed: February 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David S Cayer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, within (14) days of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff Latiesha Parsons and attorney Joseph R. Johnson shall SHOW CAUSE in writing as to why Mr. Johnson has failed to associate local counsel and file a pro hac vice motion as required by Local Rule 83.1(b)(1). (Attorney served via NEF) . Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 4/19/2021. (nvc)
April 8, 2021 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Stay by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated. Responses due by 4/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Osowski, Paul). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion to Stay. This matter is STAYED ninety days from the date of this Order. The parties shall file a status report thirty days from the date of this Order and every thirty days thereafter. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/8/2021. (DLG)
April 8, 2021 SECOND Notice to Joseph R. Johnson: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Associate local counsel. File a motion pro hac vice. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 4/15/2021. (tmg)
April 8, 2021 Set Deadlines: Initial Status Report due by 5/10/2021. (maf)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Julia Reed-Zaic terminated. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/2/2021. (DLG)
April 1, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Latiesha Parsons. Responses due by 4/15/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (rth). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
March 2, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Starr on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated (Starr, William)
March 2, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. (Osowski, Paul)
March 2, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by C R Bard Incorporated (Osowski, Paul)
March 2, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Paul Joseph Osowski on behalf of C R Bard Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated. (Osowski, Paul)
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-00887. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
March 1, 2021 Notice to Joseph R Johnson, Julia Reed-Zaic: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Associate local counsel and File a motion pro hac vice. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 3/8/2021. (rth)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Western District of North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 MDL Certified Docket, #2 Case Management Order No. 47, #3 Case Management Orders, #4 Daubert Orders, #5 Deposition Designation Orders, #6 Discovery and Privilege Orders, #7 Discovery Orders, #8 Master and Short Form Pleadings, #9 Miscellaneous Orders, #10 Motions in Limine Orders)(rth)
February 24, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
February 24, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Western District of North Carolina via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/1/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/1/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 *AMENDED By Doc. #6 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/17/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 3/1/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 49 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated. The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/1/2021.]
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *VACATED By Doc. #4 *ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 21041 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 1/13/20. (MAP) *Modified on 2/8/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 3/1/2021.]
March 31, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-887-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/1/2021.]
March 31, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-12804951 filed by Latiesha Parsons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/1/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parsons v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Paul Joseph Osowski
Represented By: William M. Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Paul Joseph Osowski
Represented By: William M. Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latiesha Parsons
Represented By: Julia Reed-Zaic
Represented By: Joseph R Johnson
Represented By: Joseph R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?