United States of America v. $16,761 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $16,761 in United States Currency
Claimant: Jermaine Lydell Sanders
Case Number: 5:2021cv00053
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 841
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Strike #13 Response in Opposition to Motion [Dkt. 13-1, at 99-121 and Dkt. 13, at 5 n.2] by United States of America. Replies due by 5/26/2021 (Johnson, J.)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jermaine Lydell Sanders. (Silverman, Stephen)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Strike #13 Response in Opposition to Motion [Dkt. 13-1, at 99-121 and Dkt. 13, at 5 n.2] by Jermaine Lydell Sanders. Responses due by 5/21/2021 (Silverman, Stephen)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States of America. Replies due by 5/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Johnson, J.)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date April 29, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, J.)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION Judicial Notice re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jermaine Lydell Sanders. Responses due by 4/30/2021 (Silverman, Stephen). Motions referred to David Keesler.
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jermaine Lydell Sanders. Responses due by 4/30/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit Index to Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10) (Silverman, Stephen). Motions referred to David Keesler.
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Certificate of Settlement Conference Pursuant to Standing Order 5:19-mc-5. Result: Unable to resolve. (Perry, Maria)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Service (Direct Notice) by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, J.)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Stephen Silverman for Jermaine Lydell Sanders (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/13/21. (mga) Modified text on 4/19/2021 (mga).
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLAIM Supplemental Rule G(5) Claim by Jermaine Lydell Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complete Admin. Claim)(Perry, Maria)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to Stephen Silverman: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF Account #Application Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 4/20/2021. (mga)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Errata to the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice & Affidavit by $16,761 in United States Currency re #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen Silverman Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4963094. (Perry, Maria)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen Silverman Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4963094. by United States of America. Replies due by 4/6/2021 (Johnson, J.)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen Silverman Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4963094. by $16,761 in United States Currency. (Perry, Maria). Motions referred to David Keesler.
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order and Warrant for Arrest in Rem. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 3/26/2021. (tmg)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against $16,761 in United States Currency, filed by United States of America.(Johnson, J.)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $16,761 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $16,761 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: J. Seth Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin Bain-Creed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jermaine Lydell Sanders
Represented By: Maria T. Perry
Represented By: Stephen Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?