Blackburn v. Teague et al
Plaintiff: Maurice Cornelius Blackburn, Jr
Defendant: FNU Smith, FNU Deal and N. Teague
Case Number: 5:2021cv00074
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Waiving Initial Partial Filing Fee and Directing Monthly Payments be Made from Prison Account of Maurice Cornelius Blackburn, Jr. Directing correctional facility to transmit payments. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 6/4/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(hms)
June 1, 2021 Filing 7 Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by Maurice Cornelius Blackburn, Jr (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tmg)
May 28, 2021 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) (nvc)
May 26, 2021 Filing 5 Pro Se MOTION to Appoint Counsel / Letter by Maurice Cornelius Blackburn, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nvc)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) by Maurice Cornelius Blackburn, Jr (tmg)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by Maurice Cornelius Blackburn, Jr (tmg) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/19/2021) (tmg).
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FNU Deal, FNU Smith, N. Teague filed by Maurice Cornelius Blackburn, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Envelope) (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackburn v. Teague et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Cornelius Blackburn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?