Greene v. Dye et al
Plaintiff: Corey D. Greene
Defendant: J. Dye, FNU Walker, FNU Ellison and FNU Duncan
Case Number: 5:2021cv00135
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Statesville Office
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 9/15/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Addendum by Corey D. Greene. Addendum to Attachment # [ #3 -1] Declaration in Support of Motion for a TRO and/or Preliminary Injunction Motion for TRO, (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope). (ejb)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED MOTION for "Temporary Restraining Order" by Corey D. Greene. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (ejb)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for "Temporary Restraining Order" by Corey D. Greene. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion for a TRO and/or Preliminary Injunction, #2 Proposed Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope) (ejb)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by Corey D. Greene. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (ejb)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against J Dye, FNU Walker, FNU Ellison, FNU Duncan, with Jury Demand, filed by Corey D. Greene. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greene v. Dye et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey D. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Dye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?