Clark v. Shields et al
Plaintiff: Angela P. Clark
Defendant: Robert J. Shields, Jr. and U-Haul Co. of Arizona
Case Number: 5:2021cv00148
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David S Cayer
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by U-Haul Co. of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Osowski, Paul). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant U-Haul Co. of Arizona's answer due 12/14/2021. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/15/2021. (DLG)
October 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Certificate of Settlement Conference Pursuant to Standing Order 5:19-mc-5. Result: Unable to resolve. (Osowski, Paul)
October 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald S. Higley, II on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Higley, Donald)
October 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Delay for Filing Certificate of Settlement Conference by U-Haul Co. of Arizona (Osowski, Paul)
October 15, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by U-Haul Co. of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Osowski, Paul). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #3 unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. U-Haul Co. of Arizona answer due 11/15/2021. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/15/2021. (DLG)
October 12, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tms)
October 12, 2021 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (tms)
October 12, 2021 Notice to Jonathan Holder: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Satisfy the Requirements for Admission to the Western District of North Carolina Federal Court. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 10/19/2021. (tms)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U-Haul Co. of Arizona (Osowski, Paul)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Caldwell County Superior Court, case number 21-CVS-1102. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5261734), filed by U-Haul Co. of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Inmate Record, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Accident Report, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Docs served on UHAZ, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - State Court File)(Osowski, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Shields et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela P. Clark
Represented By: Donald S. Higley, II
Represented By: Jonathan Ross Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Shields, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U-Haul Co. of Arizona
Represented By: Paul Joseph Osowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?