Ratchford et al v. RJS Entertainment, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hilary Hepner, Jesse Golden, Jordan Carver, Masha Lund, Rachel Koren, Abigail Ratchford, Alana Campos, Amanda Cerny, Arianny Celeste Lopez, Cielo Jean Gibson, Camila Davalos, Cora Skinner, Denise Milani Trlica, Dessie Mitcheson, Emily Scott, Emily Sears, Eva Pepaj, Hilary Fisher Vinson, Irina Voronina, Jaime Edmondson Longoria, Jamilette Gaxiola, Jessica Golden, Ina Schnitzer, Julianne Klaren, Katarina Van Derham, Lina Posada, Lucy Pinder, Mariana Davalos, Malu Lund, Megan Daniels, Paola Canas, Rachel Bernstein, Rhian Sugden, Sandra Valencia, Sara Underwood, Tiffant Toth Gray, Ursula Mayes and Jessica Burciaga
Defendant: RJS Entertainment, LLC doing business as Cheetah Gentlemen's Club, Rocco Scarfone and Cadillac's Discotheque, Inc. doing business as Thee Playhouse
Case Number: 5:2021cv00151
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by all Plaintiffs. Rocco Scarfone served on 12/1/2021, answer due 12/22/2021. (Gambale, Matthew) Modified text on 12/13/2021 (nvc).
December 10, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by all Plaintiffs. RJS Entertainment, LLC served on 12/1/2021, answer due 12/22/2021. (Gambale, Matthew) Modified text on 12/13/2021 (nvc).
December 10, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by all Plaintiffs. Cadillac's Discotheque, Inc. served on 12/1/2021, answer due 12/22/2021. (Gambale, Matthew) Modified text on 12/13/2021 (nvc).
November 16, 2021 SECOND Notice to John V. Golaszewski: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 11/23/2021. (tms)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added John V. Golaszewski for Plaintiffs. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/20/21. (kab)
October 20, 2021 Notice to John V. Golaszewski: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 10/27/2021. (kab)
October 18, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Cadillac's Discotheque, Inc., RJS Entertainment, LLC, Rocco Scarfone. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tms)
October 18, 2021 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (tms)
October 18, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. Motions referred to David Keesler: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John V. Golaszewski. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tms)
October 15, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John V. Golaszewski Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5270652. by Jessica Burciaga, Alana Campos, Paola Canas, Jordan Carver, Amanda Cerny, Megan Daniels, Camila Davalos, Mariana Davalos, Jamilette Gaxiola, Cielo Jean Gibson, Jesse Golden, Tiffant Toth Gray, Hilary Hepner, Julianne Klaren, Rachel Koren, Jaime Edmondson Longoria, Arianny Celeste Lopez, Masha Lund, Ursula Mayes, Dessie Mitcheson, Eva Pepaj, Lucy Pinder, Lina Posada, Abigail Ratchford, Emily Scott, Emily Sears, Cora Skinner, Rhian Sugden, Denise Milani Trlica, Sara Underwood, Sandra Valencia, Katarina Van Derham, Irina Voronina. (Gambale, Matthew)
October 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Ryan Gambale on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gambale, Matthew)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5270613), filed by Rhian Sugden, Cora Skinner, Mariana Davalos, Jamilette Gaxiola, Alana Campos, Abigail Ratchford, Jesse Golden, Paola Canas, Jaime Edmondson Longoria, Lucy Pinder, Masha Lund, Jordan Carver, Lina Posada, Emily Scott, Rachel Koren, Sara Underwood, Emily Sears, Julianne Klaren, Hilary Hepner, Katarina Van Derham, Megan Daniels, Camila Davalos, Tiffant Toth Gray, Amanda Cerny, Dessie Mitcheson, Eva Pepaj, Irina Voronina, Jessica Burciaga, Denise Milani Trlica, Arianny Celeste Lopez, Sandra Valencia, Ursula Mayes, Cielo Jean Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A - Abigail Ratchford Photos, #3 Exhibit B - Alana Campos Photos, #4 Exhibit C - Amanda Cerny Photos, #5 Exhibit D - Arianny Lopez Photo, #6 Exhibit E - CJ Gibson Photo, #7 Exhibit F - Camila Davalos Photos, #8 Exhibit G - Cora Skinner Photos, #9 Exhibit H - Denise Milani Photos, #10 Exhibit I - Dessie Mitcheson Photos, #11 Exhibit J - Emily Scott Photos, #12 Exhibit K - Emily Sears Photos, #13 Exhibit L - Eva Pepaj Photos, #14 Exhibit M - Hillary Hepner Photos, #15 Exhibit N - Irina Voronina Photo, #16 Exhibit O - Jaime Edmondson Longoria Photos, #17 Exhibit P - Jamillette Gaxiola Photos, #18 Exhibit Q - Jesse Golden Photos, #19 Exhibit R - Jessica Burciaga Photos, #20 Exhibit S - Jessica Hinton Photos, #21 Exhibit T - Jordan Carver Photos, #22 Exhibit U - Julianne Klaren Photos, #23 Exhibit V - Katarina Van Derham Photos, #24 Exhibit W - Lina Posada Photos, #25 Exhibit X - Lucy Pinder Photos, #26 Exhibit Y - Mariana Davalos Photos, #27 Exhibit Z - Masha Lund Photos, #28 Exhibit AA - Megan Daniels Photos, #29 Exhibit BB - Paola Canas Photos, #30 Exhibit CC - Rachel Bernsein Koren Photos, #31 Exhibit DD - Rhian Sugdem Photos, #32 Exhibit EE - Sandra Valencia Photo, #33 Exhibit FF - Sara Underwood Photos, #34 Exhibit GG - Tiffany Toth Gray Photos, #35 Exhibit HH - Ursula Mayes Photos, #36 Exhibit II - Jessica Burciaga Photo, #37 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Gambale, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ratchford et al v. RJS Entertainment, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilary Hepner
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Golden
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Carver
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Masha Lund
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Koren
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abigail Ratchford
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alana Campos
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Cerny
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arianny Celeste Lopez
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cielo Jean Gibson
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camila Davalos
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cora Skinner
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Milani Trlica
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dessie Mitcheson
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Scott
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Sears
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Pepaj
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilary Fisher Vinson
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irina Voronina
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Edmondson Longoria
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamilette Gaxiola
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Golden
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ina Schnitzer
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julianne Klaren
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katarina Van Derham
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lina Posada
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Pinder
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariana Davalos
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malu Lund
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Daniels
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paola Canas
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Bernstein
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhian Sugden
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Valencia
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Underwood
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffant Toth Gray
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula Mayes
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Burciaga
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RJS Entertainment, LLC doing business as Cheetah Gentlemen's Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocco Scarfone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cadillac's Discotheque, Inc. doing business as Thee Playhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?