Uribe v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tanya M Uribe and Tanya M. Uribe
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2021cv00160
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2021 Monthly Installment Fee Received: $ 50, receipt number CHD068832 (tlj)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Commissioner of Social Security, US Attorney and US Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Forms) (tms)
November 23, 2021 Monthly Installment Fee Received: $ 52.00, receipt number CHD068578 (tlj)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying Pltf's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to the extent that Pltf shall pay the filing fee in monthly installments of $25 until the fee is paid in full. Pltf shall pay the initial $25 installment to the Clerk's office within ten days of this Order. U.S. Marshal shall serve process upon Deft at U.S. Govt expense. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. on 11/15/2021. (ejb)
November 15, 2021 Set Deadlines: Initial $25 Installment of $402 Filing Fee due by 11/25/2021, pursuant to #3 Order. Summons(es) will not be issued and delivered to US Marshal to serve process until Initial Installment of $25 is paid. (ejb)
November 12, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tms)
November 11, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tanya M Uribe. (Dalton, Aaron)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Tanya M Uribe.(Dalton, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uribe v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya M Uribe
Represented By: Aaron Lee Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya M. Uribe
Represented By: Aaron Lee Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?