Sherrill et al v. Aziyo Biologics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: aurelia sherrill and belvin sherrill
Defendant: Aziyo Biologics, Inc., Medtronic, PLC, Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic Sofamore Danek USA, Inc. and Spinalgraft Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00172
Filed: December 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David S Cayer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Certificate of Settlement Conference Pursuant to Standing Order 5:19-mc-5. Result: Unable to resolve. (Wallace, Mona) Modified text on 1/21/2022 (nvc).
January 19, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Aziyo Biologics, Inc..(Cleary, Patrick)
January 10, 2022 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 1/31/2022. (nvc)
January 7, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Medtronic Sofamore Danek USA, Inc., Spinalgraft Technologies, LLC.(Przymusinski, Lucas)
December 20, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Complaint) with Jury Demand against Aziyo Biologics, Inc., Medtronic Sofamore Danek USA, Inc., Spinalgraft Technologies, LLC, filed by Aurelia Sherrill, Belvin Sherrill.(Hughes, John)
December 20, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Aurelia Sherrill, Belvin Sherrill. (Hughes, John)
December 20, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Aurelia Sherrill, Belvin Sherrill. Responses due by 1/3/2022 (Attachments: #1 Proposed First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) (Hughes, John). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file their First Amended Complaint within five days of this Order. So Ordered.. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/20/2021. (DLG)
December 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Acknowledgment of the Filing Copy of Notice of Removal by Aziyo Biologics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acknowledgment of the Filing of Copy of Notice of Removal)(Cleary, Patrick)
December 8, 2021 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (of Plaintiffs and Medtronic Defendants for said Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint) by Aurelia Sherrill, Belvin Sherrill. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hughes, John). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
December 8, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Aziyo Biologics, Inc..(Cleary, Patrick)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. Medtronic USA, Inc. answer due 1/7/2022; Medtronic, Inc. answer due 1/7/2022; Medtronic, PLC answer due 1/7/2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/8/2021. (DLG)
December 6, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic, PLC (Przymusinski, Lucas)
December 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas Piotr Przymusinski on behalf of Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic, PLC (Przymusinski, Lucas)
December 3, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(nvc)
December 3, 2021 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (nvc)
December 2, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aziyo Biologics, Inc. (Cleary, Patrick)
December 2, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick James Cleary on behalf of Aziyo Biologics, Inc. (Cleary, Patrick)
December 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Iredell Superior Court, case number 21CVS2797. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5342290), filed by Aziyo Biologics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Cleary, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherrill et al v. Aziyo Biologics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: aurelia sherrill
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: belvin sherrill
Represented By: John S. Hughes
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aziyo Biologics, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick James Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic, PLC
Represented By: Lucas Piotr Przymusinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic USA, Inc.
Represented By: Lucas Piotr Przymusinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc.
Represented By: Lucas Piotr Przymusinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic Sofamore Danek USA, Inc.
Represented By: Lucas Piotr Przymusinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spinalgraft Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Lucas Piotr Przymusinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?