Hilton v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: KAMERON HILTON
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. and Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corp.
Case Number: 5:2022cv00030
Filed: March 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing of Motion for MDL Transfer of Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Bijan Esfandiari, #3 Certificate of Service)(ef) Modified date filed on 5/13/2022 (ef).
April 13, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kameron Hilton. Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corp. waiver sent on 4/11/2022, answer due 6/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Waiver of Service)(Mullins, Allison)
April 13, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kameron Hilton. Merck & Co., Inc. waiver sent on 4/11/2022, answer due 6/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Waiver of Service)(Mullins, Allison)
March 21, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (nvc)
March 21, 2022 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (nvc)
March 21, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(nvc)
March 18, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Hillary Margaret Kies on behalf of Kameron Hilton (Kies, Hillary)
March 18, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by L. Cooper Harrell on behalf of Kameron Hilton (Harrell, L.)
March 18, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Mullins on behalf of Kameron Hilton (Mullins, Allison)
March 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BNCWDC-5487867), filed by Kameron Hilton.(Mullins, Allison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hilton v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAMERON HILTON
Represented By: Allison Mullins
Represented By: Hillary Margaret Kies
Represented By: L. Cooper Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?