Poteat v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jennifer Poteat
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2022cv00047
Filed: April 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Commissioner of Social Security, US Attorney and US Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM-285s)(khm)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 Amended Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue summons to the US Marshal for service. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 5/5/2022. (khm)
April 29, 2022 Filing 4 Amended MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jennifer Poteat. (Piemonte, George)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (Sealed - Participants): The Plaintiff's #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Application or pay the required filing fee within 30 days of entry of this Order. Failure to file an Amended Application or to pay the required filing fee within the time required will result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/21/2022. (maf)
April 21, 2022 Set Deadlines: Fee or Amended IFP Application due by 5/23/2022. (maf)
April 20, 2022 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(nvc)
April 19, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jennifer Poteat. (Piemonte, George)
April 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Jennifer Poteat.(Piemonte, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poteat v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Poteat
Represented By: George C. Piemonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?