Mays v. Polishchuk et al
Plaintiff: Foster Mays
Defendant: Oleg Polishchuk doing business as POP Trucking, Uber Freight, LLC and Oleg Polishchuk an individual and doing business as POP Trucking
Case Number: 5:2023cv00073
Filed: May 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Uber Freight, LLC re #13 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Bader, Steven)
July 18, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Oleg Polishchuk.(Adams, Randall)
July 18, 2023 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Uber Freight, LLC. (Harris, Jason)
July 18, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Uber Freight, LLC. Responses due by 8/1/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Rate Confirmation Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2-Broker-Carrier Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3-Bill of Lading, #4 Exhibit 4-FMCSA Company Snapshot) (Harris, Jason). Motions referred to David Keesler.
July 18, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Bader on behalf of Uber Freight, LLC (Bader, Steven)
July 12, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Certificate of Settlement Conference Pursuant to Standing Order 5:19-mc-5. Result: Unable to resolve. (Harris, Jason)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint . Uber Freight, LLC answer due 7/18/2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a Certificate of Initial Settlement Conference before filing an Answer. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/20/2023. (brl)
June 20, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Uber Freight, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Extension of Time) (Harris, Jason). Motions referred to David Keesler.
June 20, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Richard Harris on behalf of Uber Freight, LLC (Harris, Jason)
June 9, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Oleg Polishchuk. Oleg Polishchuk waiver sent on 5/26/2023, answer due 7/25/2023. (Adams, Randall)
June 9, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oleg Polishchuk. (Adams, Randall)
June 9, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall R. Adams on behalf of Oleg Polishchuk (Adams, Randall)
May 25, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Reissued Electronically as to Oleg Polishchuk, Uber Freight, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ams)
May 24, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Oleg Polishchuk, Uber Freight, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(cjs)
May 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-6082637), filed by Foster Mays.(Levine, Michael)
May 24, 2023 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and US Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(cjs)
May 24, 2023 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mays v. Polishchuk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foster Mays
Represented By: Michael J. Levine
Represented By: Cathy A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oleg Polishchuk doing business as POP Trucking
Represented By: Randall R. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Freight, LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Bader
Represented By: Jason Richard Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oleg Polishchuk an individual and doing business as POP Trucking
Represented By: Randall R. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?