Millers Capital Insurance Company v. Summit Management Services, Inc.
Defendant: Summit Management Services, Inc, and Summit Management Services, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Millers Capital Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2024cv00057
Filed: February 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2024 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Counsel as to Settlement Conference by Jonathan Edward Bukowski on behalf of Summit Management Services, Inc. (Bukowski, Jonathan)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certificate of Settlement Conference . Certificate of Settlement Conference due by 4/16/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/9/24. (mga)
April 8, 2024 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certificate of Settlement Conference by Summit Management Services, Inc.. Responses due by 4/22/2024 (Bukowski, Jonathan). Motions referred to David Keesler.
April 5, 2024 Filing 19 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Millers Capital Insurance Company by Summit Management Services, Inc..(Bukowski, Jonathan)
April 5, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Summit Management Services, Inc.. Responses due by 4/19/2024 (Bukowski, Jonathan). Motions referred to David Keesler.
April 4, 2024 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Summit Management Services, Inc., filed by Millers Capital Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Policy, #2 Exhibit B- IA Reports)(Watson, Lewis)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Defendant's #15 Second UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. Summit Management Services, Inc. answer due 4/11/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/1/24. (mga)
March 29, 2024 Filing 15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, Unopposed by Summit Management Services, Inc.. (Bukowski, Jonathan). Motions referred to David Keesler.
March 29, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry Edward Bache, Jr on behalf of Summit Management Services, Inc. (Bache, Larry)
March 29, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Edward Bukowski on behalf of Summit Management Services, Inc. (Bukowski, Jonathan)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jonathan Edward Bukowski for Summit Management Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/27/2024. (brl)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Larry Edward Bache, Jr. for Summit Management Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/27/2024. (brl)
March 27, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan Edward Bukowski Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6457973. by Summit Management Services, Inc.. (Lapouyade, Beaujeaux). Motions referred to David Keesler.
March 27, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Larry Edward Bache, Jr. Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6457943. by Summit Management Services, Inc.. (Lapouyade, Beaujeaux). Motions referred to David Keesler.
March 27, 2024 Notice to Larry Edward Bache, Jr.: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 4/3/2024. (brl)
March 27, 2024 Notice to Jonathan Edward Bukowski: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 4/3/2024. (brl)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Defendant's #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. Summit Management Services, Inc. answer due 4/1/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/11/24. (mga)
March 11, 2024 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Summit Management Services, Inc.. (Lapouyade, Beaujeaux). Motions referred to David Keesler.
March 11, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Beaujeaux de Lapouyade on behalf of Summit Management Services, Inc. (Lapouyade, Beaujeaux)
March 8, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil Warren Blackmon on behalf of Millers Capital Insurance Company (Blackmon, Neil)
March 7, 2024 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Millers Capital Insurance Company. Summit Management Services, Inc. served on 2/24/2024, answer due 3/18/2024. (Watson, Lewis)
February 20, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Summit Management Services, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tlj)
February 20, 2024 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and US Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)
February 16, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Millers Capital Insurance Company. (Watson, Lewis)
February 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Summit Management Services, Inc, with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BNCWDC-6407771), filed by Millers Capital Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit A - Policy part 2, #3 Exhibit B - IA Reports, #4 Citizenship Disclosure Form)(Watson, Lewis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millers Capital Insurance Company v. Summit Management Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Millers Capital Insurance Company
Represented By: Lewis Andrew Watson
Represented By: Neil Warren Blackmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Management Services, Inc,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Beaujeaux de Lapouyade
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Bukowski
Represented By: Larry Edward Bache, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?