Aalaam v. Movement Mortgage, LLC
Plaintiff: Anwar A. Aalaam
Defendant: Movement Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 5:2024cv00127
Filed: May 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 (a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2024 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Movement Mortgage, LLC. (Hooper, Thomas)
July 11, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Movement Mortgage, LLC. Responses due by 7/25/2024 (Hooper, Thomas). Motions referred to David Keesler.
July 11, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Certificate of Settlement Conference Pursuant to Standing Order 5:19-mc-5. Result: Unable to resolve. (Hooper, Thomas)
June 5, 2024 Filing 7 Deleted document, docketed in error. Modified on 6/5/2024 (mga).
June 5, 2024 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Movement Mortgage, LLC. (Hooper, Thomas)
June 5, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Movement Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hooper, Thomas). Motions referred to David Keesler.
May 30, 2024 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Anwar A. Aalaam. Movement Mortgage, LLC served on 5/23/2024, answer due 6/13/2024. (mek) Modified text on 6/5/2024 (mek).
May 24, 2024 Filing Fee Received: $ 405, receipt number 9752 (add)
May 21, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Reissued Conventionally with corrected case number by US Mail as to Movement Mortgage, LLC. (mek)
May 21, 2024 Standing Order of Instructions Regarding Pro Se Litigants in Civil Actions. Click on this link to retrieve the #Standing Order (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mek)
May 21, 2024 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Standing Order Requiring an Initial Settlement Conference in Civil Cases assigned to the Honorable Kenneth D. Bell (5:19-mc-5 (Doc. No. 1)). The order was served conventionally by US Mail. The filing party is directed to serve a copy of the Order with service. (mek)
May 21, 2024 Case referral reassigned to US Magistrate Judge David Keesler due to case assignment error. US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(mek)
May 20, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued Conventionally as to Movement Mortgage, LLC. (hms)
May 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Movement Mortgage, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee paid $405), filed by Anwar A. Aalaam. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (hms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aalaam v. Movement Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Movement Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Thomas G. Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anwar A. Aalaam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?