The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC
Debtor: The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC
Us Trustee: Robert B. Raschke
Trustee: Thomas Kapusta
Case Number: 3:2024bk30152
Filed: April 15, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Shon Hastings
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2024 Filing 121 Interim Application for Compensation for Thomas Kapusta, Trustee Chapter 9/11, Period: 4/16/2024 to 6/4/2024, Fee: $3630, Expenses: $207.67. Including: Notice of Application served on 6/5/2024 and Certificate of Service Filed by Attorney Thomas Kapusta Last day to object is 06/26/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kapusta, Thomas)
June 3, 2024 Filing 120 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC ( related document(s)#118 Order to Set Hearing). (Stanley, Caren)
June 2, 2024 Filing 119 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#118 Order to Set Hearing) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/02/2024. (Admin.)
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Scheduling Order Signed on 5/31/2024. Confirmation Hearing to be held on Tuesday, 8/27/2024 at 10:00 AM Quentin N. Burdick U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 2nd Floor, 655 1st Ave. N., Fargo, ND 58102. Deadline to file a plan of reorganization: Monday, July 15, 2024. Deadline to submit ballots to accept or reject plan and to file written objections to plan: Wednesday, August 14, 2024. Deadline to file or email to the Court all exhibits in support of confirmation or an objection to confirmation: Friday, August 23, 2024. If the Court receives no timely-filed objections (or if all objections are withdrawn), the Court may confirm the plan without a hearing. Attorney Caren Stanley or Attorney Drew Hushka to serve scheduling order on all creditors. (sfh, Court)
May 30, 2024 Filing 117 Status Conference Held in a Subchapter V Case (Related Doc #18). APPEARANCES BY: Attorney Caren Stanley and Attorney Drew Hushka for Debtor; Attorney Sarah Wencil for United States Trustee; Subchapter V Trustee Thomas Kapusta; Attorney Richard Olson for First Western Bank & Trust; Attorney Kent Rockstad for USA/SBA. TIME OF HEARING: 9:58 to 10:09 a.m. (sfh, Court)
May 30, 2024 Filing 116 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/30/2024 9:46:35 AM ]. File Size [ 4924 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:10:16 ]. (admin).
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Order Granting Motion for Extension of Cash Collateral Order (Related Docs #105, #114) Signed on 5/30/2024 (sfh, Court)
May 30, 2024 Hearing Cancelled (Related Doc #105 Motion for Extension of Cash Collateral Order filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC) (sfh, Court)
May 29, 2024 Filing 114 Stipulation By and Between USA/SBA and all parties Filed by Creditor USA/SBA ( related document(s)#105 Motion to Extend Time). (Rockstad, Kent)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Order Granting Motion by First Western Bank & Trust for Attorney Richard Olson to Appear By Video Conference at the hearing on Debtor's Motion for Extension of Cash Collateral Order scheduled for Thursday, May 30, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. (Related Doc #112). The latest video conference instructions and the link to join are located at: https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/video-conferences. To test your video conference connection, please submit the form located at https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/VCtestform. Ordered By Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only). Signed on 5/29/2024. (sfh, Court)
May 29, 2024 Filing 112 Motion to Appear By Video Conference (related documents #105 Motion to Extend Time) Filed by Creditor First Western Bank & Trust (Olson, Richard)
May 29, 2024 Filing 111 Conditional Objection to (related document(s): #105 Motion to Extend Time to Cash Collateral Order filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC) Including Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor USA/SBA (Rockstad, Kent)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Order Granting Motion by Subchapter V Trustee for Thomas Kapusta to Appear By Video Conference at the hearing on Debtor's Motion for Extension of Cash Collateral Order scheduled for Thursday, May 30, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. (Related Doc #109). The latest video conference instructions and the link to join are located at: https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/video-conferences. To test your video conference connection, please submit the form located at https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/VCtestform. Ordered By Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only). Signed on 5/21/2024 (sfh, Court)
May 21, 2024 Filing 109 Motion to Appear By Video Conference (related documents #105 Motion to Extend Time) Filed by Trustee Thomas Kapusta (Kapusta, Thomas)
May 17, 2024 Filing 108 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC ( related document(s)#105 Motion to Extend Time, #106 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury, #107 Notice of Hearing). (Stanley, Caren)
May 17, 2024 Filing 107 Notice of Hearing On #105 Motion for Extension of Cash Collateral Order filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC. Hearing to be held on 5/30/2024 at 10:00 AM Quentin N. Burdick U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 2nd Floor, 655 1st Ave. N., Fargo, ND 58102. (sfh, Court)
May 16, 2024 Filing 106 Declaration of Jared Hardy in Support of Extention Including Exhibits Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC ( related document(s)#105 Motion to Extend Time). (Stanley, Caren) (enhanced docket) Modified on 5/17/2024 (vck, Court).
May 16, 2024 Filing 105 Motion to Extend Time to Cash Collateral Order Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC (Stanley, Caren)
May 16, 2024 Trustee's Initial Report & First Meeting Held Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke ( related document(s)#21 Meeting of Creditors Chapter). (Wencil, Sarah)
May 15, 2024 Filing 104 Pre-Status Conference Report Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC ( related document(s)#18 Order to Set Status Conference). (Stanley, Caren)
May 15, 2024 Filing 103 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC ( related document(s)#99 Statement of Financial Affairs, #100 Amended Schedules, #101 Certificate of Service, #102 Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)). (Stanley, Caren)
May 14, 2024 Filing 102 Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s) Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC (related document(s) #100 Amended Schedules). (Stanley, Caren). (corrected docket linkage; requested certificate of service) Modified on 5/14/2024 (mjk, Court).
May 14, 2024 Filing 101 Certificate of Service - Update Creditor's Addresses Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC ( related document(s)#21 Meeting of Creditors Chapter). (Stanley, Caren)
May 14, 2024 Filing 100 Amended Schedules/Statements filed: Schedule D, Schedule EF, Schedule G, Summary of Schedules, Amendment Cover Sheet Fee Amount $34, Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC. (Stanley, Caren)
May 14, 2024 Filing 99 Amended Schedules/Statements filed: Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC. (Stanley, Caren) (corrected event) Modified on 5/14/2024 (mjk, Court).
May 14, 2024 Receipt of Amended Schedules(# 24-30152) [misc,amdsch] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1544935. Fee amount 34.00. (U.S. Treasury)
May 11, 2024 Filing 98 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#96 Order on Generic Motion) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/11/2024. (Admin.)
May 9, 2024 Filing 97 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/9/2024 9:44:40 AM ]. File Size [ 41523 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:26:30 ]. (admin).
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Order Granting in part and Denying in part Subchapter V Trustee's Motion for Post-Petition Security Deposit (Related Doc #35). Signed on 5/9/2024 (sfh, Court)
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Order Approving Application to Employ Caren Stanley and Vogel Law Firm (Related Doc #14). The application to employ is APPROVED effective April 15, 2024, subject to the limitations on compensation provided by 11 U.S.C. 328. This order is not a determination that the services are necessary or that the rates charged are reasonable. The person or entity employed under this order shall file a fee application in accordance with the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedures. See Fed. R. Bank. P. 2016, 2017 and 11 U.S.C. 329, 330. Applicant must also comply with Local Rules. As required by any applicable federal rule or statute, the filer shall serve this docket text only order on all appropriate parties that will not receive notice of electronic filing. Signed on 5/9/2024 (sfh, Court)
May 9, 2024 Filing 94 Hearing Held On #35 Motion for Post-Petition Security Deposit filed by Trustee Thomas Kapusta. APPEARANCES BY: Attorney Drew Hushka and Attorney Caren Stanley for Debtor; Attorney Sarah Wencil for United States Trustee; Attorney Richard Olson for First Western Bank & Trust; Thomas Kapusta, Subchapter V Trustee. DISPOSITION: Motion by Subchapter V Trustee for Post-Petition Security Deposit is granted in part and denied in part. TIME OF HEARING: 9:57 to 11:24 a.m. (sfh, Court)
May 9, 2024 Filing 93 Hearing Held On #14 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC. APPEARANCES BY: Attorney Drew Hushka and Attorney Caren Stanley for Debtor; Attorney Sarah Wencil for United States Trustee; Attorney Richard Olson for First Western Bank & Trust; Thomas Kapusta, Subchapter V Trustee. DISPOSITION: Application by Debtor to Employ Vogel Law Firm as Attorneys for Debtor is APPROVED. TIME OF HEARING: 9:57 to 11:24 a.m. (sfh, Court)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Order Granting Motion by First Western Bank & Trust for Attorney Richard Olson to Appear By Video Conference at the hearing on Application to Employ Vogel Law First as Attorney for Debtor and Motion by Subchapter V Trustee Thomas Kapusta for Post Petition Security Deposit scheduled for Thursday, May 9, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. (Related Doc #91). The latest video conference instructions and the link to join are located at: https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/video-conferences. To test your video conference connection, please submit the form located at https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/VCtestform. Ordered By Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only). Signed on 5/8/2024. (sfh, Court)
May 8, 2024 Filing 91 Motion to Appear By Video Conference (related documents #14 Application to Employ) Filed by Creditor First Western Bank & Trust (Olson, Richard)
May 7, 2024 Filing 90 Amended Witness List Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC ( related document(s)#14 Application to Employ, #56 Notice of Hearing). (Stanley, Caren)
May 7, 2024 Filing 89 Witness List Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC (Re: #14 Application to Employ Vogel Law Firm as Attorneys for Debtor (Stanley, Caren). (corrected linkage) Modified on 5/7/2024 (vck, Court).
May 7, 2024 Filing 88 Exhibit List Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC (Re: #14 Application to Employ Vogel Law Firm as Attorneys for Debtor). (Stanley, Caren). (corrected linkage) Modified on 5/7/2024 (vck, Court).
May 2, 2024 Filing 87 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#63 Notice of Incomplete Filing) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/02/2024. (Admin.)
May 2, 2024 Filing 86 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/2/2024 2:52:30 PM ]. File Size [ 4645 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:09:41 ]. (admin).
May 2, 2024 Filing 85 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC ( related document(s)#72 Objection). (Stanley, Caren)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Order Granting Motion (I) Authorizing the Debtor to Use Cash Collateral Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 363, (II) Granting Adequate Protection to the Prepetition Secured Parties Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105, 361, 362, 363, 503, 507, and 552, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (IV) Granting Related Relief (Related Doc #3). Signed on 5/2/2024 (sfh, Court)
May 2, 2024 Filing 83 Hearing Held On (Related Doc #3 Motion (I) Authorizing the Debtor to Use Cash Collateral Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 363, (II) Granting Adequate Protection to the Pepetition Secured Parties Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105, 361, 362, 363, 503, and 552, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay and (IV) Granting Related Relief filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC. APPEARANCES BY: Attorney Caren Stanley for Debtor; Attorney Sarah Wencil for United States Trustee; Thomas Kapusta, Subchapter V Trustee; Attorney Kent Rockstad for USA/SBA; Attorney Ryan Quarne for First Western Bank & Trust. DISPOSITION: Motion by Debtor to Use Cash Collateral is GRANTED. TIME OF HEARING: 3:00 to 3:09 p.m. (sfh, Court)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Order Granting Motion Authorizing Maintenance, Administration, and Continuation of Certain Customer Programs (Related Doc #7). Signed on 5/2/2024 (sfh, Court)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Order Granting Motion (A) Authorizing the Maintenance of Bank Accounts; (B) Authorizing the Continued Use of Cash Management System; and (C) Waiving the Requirements of 11 U.S.C. 345(b) (Related Doc #6). Signed on 5/2/2024 (sfh, Court)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Order Granting Motion for Leave to Pay Claims of Critical Vendors (Related Doc #4). Signed on 5/2/2024 (sfh, Court)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Order Granting Motion (A) Authorizing Debtor to Pay and Honor Certain Prepetition Wages, Benefits, and Other Compensation Obligations; and (B) Authorizing the Banks to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Relating to Such Obligations by Debtor (Related Doc #2). Signed on 5/2/2024 (sfh, Court)
May 2, 2024 Filing 78 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Including: Certificate of Service by Ryan G Quarne Filed by Creditor First Western Bank & Trust. (Quarne, Ryan)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Order Granting Motion by Subchapter V Trustee Thomas Kapusta to Appear By Video Conference at the hearing on Subchapter V Trustee's Motion for Post-Petition Security Deposit Scheduled for Thursday, May 9, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. (Related Doc #75). The latest video conference instructions and the link to join are located at: https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/video-conferences. To test your video conference connection, please submit the form located at https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/VCtestform. Ordered By Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only). Signed on 5/2/2024. (sfh, Court)
May 2, 2024 Filing 76 Response to (related document(s): #35 Motion Including: Notice of Motion served on 4/17/2024 and Certificate of Service filed by Trustee Thomas Kapusta, #72 Objection filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC) Including Certificate of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke (Wencil, Sarah)
May 2, 2024 Filing 75 Motion to Appear By Video Conference (related documents #35 Motion of Subchapter V Trustee for Post-Petition Security Deposit) Filed by Trustee Thomas Kapusta (Kapusta, Thomas) (enhanced docket) Modified on 5/2/2024 (vck, Court).
May 2, 2024 Filing 74 Supplemental Declaration of Jared Hardy in Support of Cash Collateral Motion Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC ( related document(s)#3 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #66 Objection, #69 Objection). (Stanley, Caren) (enhanced docket) Modified on 5/2/2024 (vck, Court).
May 2, 2024 Hearing Cancelled (No objections filed to these motions (RE: related document(s)#2 Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Authorizing Debtor to Pay and Honor Certain Prepetition Wages, Benefits, and Other Compensation Obligations; and (B) Authorizing the Banks to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Relating to Such Objections by Debtor, #4 Motion for Leave to Pay Claims of Critical Vendors, #6 Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing Maintenance, Administration, and Continuation of Certain Customer Programs by Debtor, #7 Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Authorizing the Maintenance of Bank Accounts (B) Authorizing the Continued Use of Cash Management Systej; and (C) Waiving the Requirements of 11 U.S.C. 345(b)) (sfh, Court) Modified on 5/2/2024 (sfh, Court).
May 1, 2024 Filing 73 Notice of Hearing On #35 Motion for Post-Petition Security Deposit filed by Subchapter V Trustee Thomas Kapusta. Hearing to be held on 5/9/2024 at 10:00 AM Quentin N. Burdick U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 2nd Floor, 655 1st Ave. N., Fargo, ND 58102. (sfh, Court)
May 1, 2024 Filing 72 Objection to (related document(s): #35 Motion Including: Notice of Motion served on 4/17/2024 and Certificate of Service filed by Trustee Thomas Kapusta) Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC (Stanley, Caren)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Order Granting Motion by Subchapter V Trustee for Thomas Kapusta to Appear By Video Conference at hearing on the Final Hearings on First Day Motions scheduled for Thursday, May 2, 2024, at 3:00 p.m. (Related Doc #68). The latest video conference instructions and the link to join are located at: https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/video-conferences. To test your video conference connection, please submit the form located at https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/VCtestform. Ordered By Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only). Signed on 5/1/2024. (sfh, Court)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Order Granting Motion by First Western Bank & Trust for Attorney Richard P. Olson to Appear By Video Conference at the Final Hearings on First Day Motions scheduled for Thursday, May 2, 2024, at 3:00 p.m. (Related Doc #67). The latest video conference instructions and the link to join are located at: https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/video-conferences. To test your video conference connection, please submit the form located at https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/VCtestform. Ordered By Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only). Signed on 5/1/2024. (sfh, Court) Modified on 5/1/2024 (sfh, Court).
April 30, 2024 Filing 69 Conditional Objection to (related document(s): #3 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtors Motion for Interim and Final Orders (i) Authorizing the Debtor to use Cash Collateral Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 363, (ii) Granting Adequate Protection to the Prepetition Secured Parties Pursu filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC) Including Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor USA/SBA (Rockstad, Kent)
April 30, 2024 Filing 68 Motion to Appear By Video Conference (related documents #2 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #3 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #6 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #7 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #14 Application to Employ) Filed by Trustee Thomas Kapusta (Kapusta, Thomas)
April 30, 2024 Filing 67 Motion to Appear By Video Conference (related documents #2 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #3 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #6 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #7 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions) Filed by Creditor First Western Bank & Trust (Olson, Richard)
April 30, 2024 Filing 66 Supplemental Objection to (Re: #2 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions for Entry of an Order (A) Authorizing Debtor to Pay and Honor Certain Prepetition Wages, Benefits, and Other Compensation Obligations; and (B) Authorizing the Banks to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Relating to Such Obligations filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC, #3 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtors Motion for Interim and Final Orders (i) Authorizing the Debtor to use Cash Collateral Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 363, (ii) Granting Adequate Protection to the Prepetition Secured Parties Pursuant Parties Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105, 361, 362, 363, 503, 507, and 552, (iii) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (iv) Granting Related Relief filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC, #4 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Motion for Leave to Pay Claims of Critical Vendors filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC, #6 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Motion for Entry of an Order (a) Authorizing the Maintenance of Bank Accounts; (b) Authorizing the Continued Use of Cash Management System; and (c) Waiving the Requirements of 11 U.S.C. 345(b) on an Interim Basis filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC, #7 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing Maintenance, Administration, and Continuation of Certain Customer Programs filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC) Including Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor First Western Bank & Trust (Olson, Richard) (enhanced docket) Modified on 4/30/2024 (vck, Court).
April 30, 2024 Filing 65 Response to and Including Declaration of Steven Johnson (RE: #14 Application to Employ Vogel Law Firm as Attorneys for Debtor; #54 Objection filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke) Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC (Hushka, Drew) (enhanced docket) Modified on 4/30/2024 (vck, Court).
April 30, 2024 Filing 64 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC. (Stanley, Caren)
April 30, 2024 Filing 63 Notice of Incomplete Filing (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC) (vck, Court)
April 29, 2024 Filing 62 Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC. (Stanley, Caren)
April 29, 2024 Filing 61 Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC. (Stanley, Caren)
April 29, 2024 Filing 60 Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules, Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC. (Stanley, Caren) (enhanced docket) Modified on 4/29/2024 (vck, Court).
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Order Granting Motion by United States Trustee for Attorney Sarah Wencil to Appear By Video Conference at the Final Hearings on First Day Motions scheduled for Thursday, May 2, 2024, at 3:00 p.m., and the hearing on Application to Employ Vogel Law Firm as Attorneys for Debtor scheduled for Thursday, May 9, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. (Related Doc #58). The latest video conference instructions and the link to join are located at: https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/video-conferences. To test your video conference connection, please submit the form located at https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/VCtestform. Ordered By Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only). Signed on 4/29/2024. (sfh, Court)
April 29, 2024 Filing 58 Motion to Appear By Video Conference (related documents #56 Notice of Hearing) Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke (Wencil, Sarah)
April 28, 2024 Filing 57 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#56 Notice of Hearing) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/28/2024. (Admin.)
April 26, 2024 Filing 56 Amended Notice of Hearing on #14 Application to Employ Vogel Law Firm as Attorneys for Debtor. Hearing to be held on 5/9/2024 at 10:00 AM at Quentin N. Burdick U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 2nd Floor, 655 1st Ave. N., Fargo, ND 58102. (mjk, Court)
April 26, 2024 Filing 55 (SEE #56 Amended Notice of Hearing) Notice of Hearing on #14 Application to Employ Vogel Law Firm as Attorneys for Debtor. Hearing to be held on 5/2/2024 at 3:00 PM at Quentin N. Burdick U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 2nd Floor, 655 1st Ave. N., Fargo, ND 58102. (mjk, Court) Modified on 4/26/2024 (mjk, Court).
April 26, 2024 Filing 54 Objection to (related document(s): #14 Application to Employ Vogel Law Firm as Attorneys for Debtor Including: Notice of Motion served on 4/15/2024 and Certificate of Service filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC) Including Certificate of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke (Wencil, Sarah)
April 22, 2024 Filing 53 Statement of Operations for Small Business Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC ( related document(s) 11 Chapter 11 Small Business Deadlines). (Stanley, Caren)
April 22, 2024 Filing 52 Small Business Cash Flow Statement Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC ( related document(s) 11 Chapter 11 Small Business Deadlines). (Stanley, Caren)
April 22, 2024 Filing 51 Small Business Balance Sheet Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC ( related document(s) 11 Chapter 11 Small Business Deadlines). (Stanley, Caren)
April 22, 2024 Filing 50 Small Business Federal Income Tax Documents for the Year for 2023 Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC ( related document(s) 11 Chapter 11 Small Business Deadlines). (Stanley, Caren)
April 19, 2024 Filing 49 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC ( related document(s)#42 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #43 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #44 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #45 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #46 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). (Stanley, Caren)
April 18, 2024 Filing 48 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. (RE: related document(s)#21 Meeting of Creditors Chapter) No. of Notices: 70. Notice Date 04/18/2024. (Admin.)
April 18, 2024 Filing 47 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/18/2024 9:56:02 AM ]. File Size [ 27192 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:56:39 ]. (admin).
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order Granting Interim Relief on Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Authorizing the Maintenance of Bank Accounts; (B) Authorizing the Continued Use of Cash Management System; and (C) Waiving the Requirements of 11 U.S.C. 345(b)(Related Doc #6). 15.The final hearing on this matter will be held on May 2, 2024, at 3:00 p.m. The deadline to object to final relief is April 30, 2024. Signed on 4/18/2024 (dat, Court)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order Granting Interim Relief on Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing Maintenance, Administration, and Continuation of Certain Customer Programs (Related Doc #7). A final hearing on this matter will be held on May 2, 2024, at 3:00 p.m. The deadline to file an objection to final relief is April 30, 2024. Signed on 4/18/2024 (dat, Court)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order Granting Interim Relief on Motion for Leave to Pay Claims of Critical Vendorsns(Related Doc #4). The final hearing on this matter will be held on May 2, 2024, at 3:00 p.m. The deadline to object to final relief is April 30, 2024. Signed on 4/18/2024 (dat, Court)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order Granting Interim Relief on Motion Motion for Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtor to Use Cash Collateral Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 363, (II) Granting Adequate Protection to the Prepetition Secured Parties Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105, 361, 362, 363, 503, 507, and 552, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (IV) Granting Related Relief.(Related Doc #3). The final hearing on this matter will be held on May 2, 2024, at 3:00 p.m. The deadline to object to final relief is April 30, 2024. Signed on 4/18/2024 (dat, Court)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Order Granting Interim Relief on Motion (A) Authorizing Debtor to Pay and Honor Certain Prepetition Wages, Benefits, and Other Compensation Obligations; and (B) Authorizing the Banks to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Relating to Such Obligations.(Related Doc #2). Signed on 4/18/2024 (dat, Court)
April 18, 2024 Filing 41 Hearing Held - APPEARANCES BY: Caren Stanley and Drew Huschka, attorneys for debtor and Jared Hardy on behalf of debtor; Sarah J. Wencil for United States Trustee; Thomas Kapusta, Trustee; Kent Rockstad for USA/SBA and Alan Haut for SBA; Richard Olson for creditor First Western Bank & Trust. TIME OF HEARING: 9:55 am to 10:52 am. (RE: related document(s) #2 Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Authorizing Debtor to Pay and Honor Certain Prepetition Wages, Benefits, and Other Compensation Obligations, and (B) Authorizing the Banks to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Relating to Such Obligations; #3 Motion for Interim and Final Orders (i) Authorizing the Debtor to use Cash Collateral Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 363, (ii) Granting Adequate Protection to the Prepetition Secured Parties Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105, 361, 362, 363, 503, 507, and 552, (iii) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (iv) Granting Related Relief; #4Motion for Leave to Pay Claims of Critical Vendors; #6 Motion for Entry of an Order (a) Authorizing the Maintenance of Bank Accounts, (b) Authorizing the Continued Use of Cash Management System, and (c) Waiving the Requirements of 11 U.S.C. 345(b) on an Interim Basis; #7 Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing Maintenance, Administration, and Continuation of Certain Customer Programs filed by The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC. (dat, Court)
April 18, 2024 Filing 40 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC ( related document(s)#18 Order to Set Status Conference). (Stanley, Caren)
April 17, 2024 Filing 39 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#18 Order to Set Status Conference) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/17/2024. (Admin.)
April 17, 2024 Filing 38 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#15 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/17/2024. (Admin.)
April 17, 2024 Filing 37 Notice of Filing Revised Proposed Orders Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC (RE: related document(s)#2 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER (A) AUTHORIZING DEBTOR TO PAY AND HONOR CERTAIN PREPETITION WAGES, BENEFITS, AND OTHER COMPENSATION OBLIGATIONS; AND (B) AUTHORIZING THE BANKS TO HONOR AND PROCESS CHECKS AND TRANS, #3 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtors Motion for Interim and Final Orders (i) Authorizing the Debtor to use Cash Collateral Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 363, (ii) Granting Adequate Protection to the Prepetition Secured Parties Pursu, #6 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Motion for Entry of an Order (a) Authorizing the Maintenance of Bank Accounts; (b) Authorizing the Continued Use of Cash Management System; and (c) Waiving the Requirements of 11 U.S.C. 345(b) on). (Stanley, Caren)
April 17, 2024 Filing 36 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 2 to Doc 3 - Cash Collateral Motion - Amended Budget Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC ( related document(s)#3 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). (Stanley, Caren)
April 17, 2024 Filing 35 Motion of Subchapter V Trustee for Post-Petition Security Deposit Including: Notice of Motion served on 4/17/2024 and Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Thomas Kapusta Last day to object is 05/1/2024. (Kapusta, Thomas) (enhanced docket) Modified on 4/17/2024 (vck, Court).
April 17, 2024 Filing 34 Certificate of Service Using new address for Randall Klemisch Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC ( related document(s)#2 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #3 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #6 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #7 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #9 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury, #13 Motion to Expedite Hearing, #14 Application to Employ). (Stanley, Caren)
April 17, 2024 Filing 33 Certificate of Service to update current address for Randall Klemisch Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC ( related document(s)#21 Meeting of Creditors Chapter). (Stanley, Caren)
April 17, 2024 Filing 32 Objection to (related document(s): #3 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtors Motion for Interim and Final Orders (i) Authorizing the Debtor to use Cash Collateral Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 363, (ii) Granting Adequate Protection to the Prepetition Secured Parties Pursu filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC) Including Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor USA/SBA (Rockstad, Kent)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Amended Order Granting Motion for Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee Thomas Kapusta to Appear By Video Conference at Expedited Hearing on #2, #3, #4, #6, #7 Chapter 11 First Day Motions scheduled for Thursday, April 18, 2024, at 10 a.m. (Related Doc #29). The latest video conference instructions and the link to join are located at: https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/video-conferences. To test your video conference connection, please submit the form located at https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/VCtestform. Ordered by Judge Shon Hastings (Text order only). Signed on 4/17/2024 (mjk, Court)
April 17, 2024 Filing 30 Objection to (related document(s): #2 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Authorizing Debtor to Pay and Honor Certain Prepetition Wages, Benefits, and Other Compensation Obligations; and (B) Authorizing the Banks to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Relating to Such Obligations; #3 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Interim and Final Orders (i) Authorizing the Debtor to use Cash Collateral Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 363, (ii) Granting Adequate Protection to the Prepetition Secured Parties Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105, 361, 362, 363, 503, 507, and 552, (iii) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (iv) Granting Related Relief; #4 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Motion for Leave to Pay Claims of Critical Vendors; #6 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Motion for Entry of an Order (a) Authorizing the Maintenance of Bank Accounts; (b) Authorizing the Continued Use of Cash Management System; and (c) Waiving the Requirements of 11 U.S.C. 345(b); #7 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing Maintenance, Administration, and Continuation of Certain Customer Programs. Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company) Filed by Creditor First Western Bank & Trust (Olson, Richard) (enhanced docket) Modified on 4/17/2024 (vck, Court).
April 17, 2024 Filing 29 Motion to Appear By Video Conference (related documents #2 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #3 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #6 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #7 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions) Filed by Trustee Thomas Kapusta (Kapusta, Thomas)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order Granting Motion by United States Trustee for Attorney Sarah Wencil to Appear By Video Conference at Expedited Hearing on #2, #3, #4, #6, #7 Chapter 11 First Day Motions scheduled for Thursday, April 18, 2024, at 10 a.m. (Related Doc #24). The latest video conference instructions and the link to join are located at: https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/video-conferences. To test your video conference connection, please submit the form located at https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/VCtestform. Ordered by Judge Shon Hastings (Text order only). Signed on 4/17/2024 (mjk, Court)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order Granting Motion by First Western Bank & Trust for Attorney Richard Olson to Appear By Telephone at Expedited Hearing on #2, #3, #4, #6, #7 Chapter 11 First Day Motions scheduled for Thursday, April 18, 2024, at 10 a.m. (Related Doc #23). Parties appearing by telephone are not permitted to offer evidence or cross examine witnesses at the hearing. Telephone conference instructions: Call 701-297-7116; enter Meeting ID 088076463# and you will be connected to the conference. Please identify yourself after you have joined the conference. Ordered by Judge Shon Hastings (Text order only). Signed on 4/17/2024 (mjk, Court)
April 17, 2024 Filing 26 Objection to (Re: #2 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Authorizing Debtor to Pay and Honor Certain Prepetition Wages, Benefits, and Other Compensation Obligations; and (B) Authorizing the Banks to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Relating to Such Obligations; #3 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Interim and Final Orders (i) Authorizing the Debtor to use Cash Collateral Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 363, (ii) Granting Adequate Protection to the Prepetition Secured Parties Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105, 361, 362, 363, 503, 507, and 552, (iii) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (iv) Granting Related Relief; #4 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Motion for Leave to Pay Claims of Critical Vendors; #6 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Motion for Entry of an Order (a) Authorizing the Maintenance of Bank Accounts; (b) Authorizing the Continued Use of Cash Management System; and (c) Waiving the Requirements of 11 U.S.C. 345(b); #7 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing Maintenance, Administration, and Continuation of Certain Customer Programs. Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company) Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke (Wencil, Sarah) (enhanced docket) Modified on 4/17/2024 (vck, Court).
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 (SEE Amended Order at #31) Order Granting Motion for Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee Thomas Kapusta to Appear by Telephone at Expedited Hearing on #2, #3, #4, #6, #7 Chapter 11 First Day Motions scheduled for Thursday, April 18, 2024, at 10 a.m. (Related Doc #22). Parties appearing by telephone are not permitted to offer evidence or cross examine witnesses at the hearing. Telephone conference instructions: Call 701-297-7116; enter Meeting ID 088076463# and you will be connected to the conference. Please identify yourself after you have joined the conference. Ordered by Judge Shon Hastings (Text order only). Signed on 4/17/2024 (mjk, Court) Modified on 4/17/2024 (mjk, Court).
April 17, 2024 Filing 24 Motion to Appear By Video Conference (related documents #2 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #3 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #6 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #7 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions) Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke (Wencil, Sarah)
April 17, 2024 Filing 23 Motion to Appear By Telephone (related documents #2 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #3 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #6 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #7 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions) Filed by Creditor First Western Bank & Trust (Olson, Richard)
April 16, 2024 Filing 22 Motion to Appear By Telephone (related documents #2 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #3 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #6 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #7 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions) Filed by Trustee Thomas Kapusta (Kapusta, Thomas)
April 16, 2024 Filing 21 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/16/2024 at 01:30 PM Telephone conference ONLY. Toll free: 866-821-5980, Participant # 9065076. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/15/2024. Proofs of Claim due by 6/24/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/15/2024. (vck, Court)
April 16, 2024 Filing 20 Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee . Thomas Kapusta added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke. (Wencil, Sarah)
April 16, 2024 Filing 19 Certificate of Service (Supplemental) re service by mail on Scott Laboratories Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC ( related document(s)#2 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #3 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #6 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #7 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #9 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury, #14 Application to Employ, #15 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing). (Stanley, Caren)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Setting Telephonic Status Conference in a Case Filed Under Subchapter V Signed on 4/15/2024. Telephonic Hearing to be held on 5/30/2024 at 10:00 AM. Pre-Status Conference Report Due by 5/16/2024. Attorneys Caren Stanley and Drew Hushka to serve order on interested parties. (mjk, Court)
April 15, 2024 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Including: Certificate of Service by Kent Rockstad Filed by Creditor USA/SBA. (Rockstad, Kent)
April 15, 2024 Filing 16 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC ( related document(s)#15 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing). (Stanley, Caren)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Granting Motion Expedite Hearing Signed on 4/15/2024 (Related Doc #13). Expedited Hearing on to #2 Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Authorizing Debtor to Pay and Honor Certain Prepetition Wages, Benefits, and Other Compensation Obligations, and (B) Authorizing the Banks to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Relating to Such Obligations; #3 Motion for Interim and Final Orders (i) Authorizing the Debtor to use Cash Collateral Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 363, (ii) Granting Adequate Protection to the Prepetition Secured Parties Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105, 361, 362, 363, 503, 507, and 552, (iii) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (iv) Granting Related Relief; #4 Motion for Leave to Pay Claims of Critical Vendors; #6 Motion for Entry of an Order (a) Authorizing the Maintenance of Bank Accounts, (b) Authorizing the Continued Use of Cash Management System, and (c) Waiving the Requirements of 11 U.S.C. 345(b) on an Interim Basis; #7 Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing Maintenance, Administration, and Continuation of Certain Customer Programs to be held on 4/18/2024 at 10:00 AM Quentin N. Burdick U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 2nd Floor, 655 1st Ave. N., Fargo, ND 58102. Written objections to interim relief shall be filed by noon on Wednesday, April 17, 2024. A final hearing on Debtor's expedited motions will be held on Thursday, May 2, 2024, at 3:00 p.m. Additional objections to the motions, if any, must be filed not later than Tuesday, April 30, 2024. Attorneys Caren Stanley and Drew Hushka to serve order. (mjk, Court)
April 15, 2024 Filing 14 Application to Employ Vogel Law Firm as Attorneys for Debtor Including: Notice of Motion served on 4/15/2024 and Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC Last day to object is 05/6/2024. (Stanley, Caren) (Updated to 21 day Objection period) Modified on 4/15/2024 (vck, Court).
April 15, 2024 Filing 13 Motion to Expedite Hearing (related documents #2 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #3 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #6 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #7 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions) Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC (Stanley, Caren)
April 15, 2024 Filing 12 Copy of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition emailed to Securities and Exchange Commission at denver@sec.gov (Re: #1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC) (vck, Court)
April 15, 2024 Filing 11 Chapter 11 Small Business Deadlines SB Statement of Operations Due: 4/22/2024. SB Balance Sheet: 4/22/2024. Tax Return Deadline: 4/22/2024. SB Cash Flow Statement: 4/22/2024. (vck, Court)
April 15, 2024 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Including: Certificate of Service by Richard P. Olson Filed by Creditor First Western Bank & Trust. (Olson, Richard)
April 15, 2024 Filing 9 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC ( related document(s)#2 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #3 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #6 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #7 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #8 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions). (Stanley, Caren)
April 15, 2024 Filing 8 (INCORRECT EVENT USED. See #13 Motion to Expedite Hearing) Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Motion to Expedite Relief Pursuant to Federal Rule 9006(c) Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC (Stanley, Caren) Modified on 4/15/2024 (mjk, Court).
April 15, 2024 Filing 7 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing Maintenance, Administration, and Continuation of Certain Customer Programs Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC (Hushka, Drew)
April 15, 2024 Filing 6 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Motion for Entry of an Order (a) Authorizing the Maintenance of Bank Accounts; (b) Authorizing the Continued Use of Cash Management System; and (c) Waiving the Requirements of 11 U.S.C. 345(b) on an Interim Basis Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC (Hushka, Drew)
April 15, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Including: Certificate of Service by Sarah J. Wencil Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke. (Wencil, Sarah)
April 15, 2024 Filing 4 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Motion for Leave to Pay Claims of Critical Vendors Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC (Stanley, Caren)
April 15, 2024 Filing 3 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtors Motion for Interim and Final Orders (i) Authorizing the Debtor to use Cash Collateral Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 363, (ii) Granting Adequate Protection to the Prepetition Secured Parties Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105, 361, 362, 363, 503, 507, and 552, (iii) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (iv) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC (Stanley, Caren)
April 15, 2024 Filing 2 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Authorizing Debtor to Pay and Honor Certain Prepetition Wages, Benefits, and Other Compensation Obligations; and (B) Authorizing the Banks to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Relating to Such Obligations. Filed by Debtor The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC (Hushka, Drew) (enhanced docket) Modified on 4/15/2024 (vck, Court).
April 15, 2024 Filing 1 Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition Non-Individual, List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, Corporate Ownership Statement, Verification of Creditor Matrix and Matrix. Receipt Number o, Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Caren W. Stanley on behalf of The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 07/15/2024. Deficiency Deadlines Updated Incomplete Filings due by 4/29/2024. Sect 521 Incomp Filings Due: 5/30/2024. Summary of assets and liabilities due 4/29/2024. Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules due 4/29/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 4/29/2024. Schedule A/B due 4/29/2024. Schedule D due 4/29/2024. Schedule E/F due 4/29/2024. Schedule G due 4/29/2024. Schedule H due 4/29/2024. Attorney Disclosure Statement due 4/29/2024. (Stanley, Caren) (added deficiencies) Modified on 4/15/2024 (vck, Court). (removed incorrect deadline) Modified on 4/29/2024 (vck, Court).
April 15, 2024 Final Hearing Set on #2 Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Authorizing Debtor to Pay and Honor Certain Prepetition Wages, Benefits, and Other Compensation Obligations, and (B) Authorizing the Banks to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Relating to Such Obligations; #3 Motion for Interim and Final Orders (i) Authorizing the Debtor to use Cash Collateral Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 363, (ii) Granting Adequate Protection to the Prepetition Secured Parties Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105, 361, 362, 363, 503, 507, and 552, (iii) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (iv) Granting Related Relief; #4 Motion for Leave to Pay Claims of Critical Vendors; #6 Motion for Entry of an Order (a) Authorizing the Maintenance of Bank Accounts, (b) Authorizing the Continued Use of Cash Management System, and (c) Waiving the Requirements of 11 U.S.C. 345(b) on an Interim Basis; #7 Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing Maintenance, Administration, and Continuation of Certain Customer Programs. Final Hearing to be held on 5/2/2024 at 3:00 PM Quentin N. Burdick U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 2nd Floor, 655 1st Ave. N., Fargo, ND 58102. Additional objections to the motions, if any, shall be filed not later than Tuesday, April 30, 2024. (mjk, Court)
April 15, 2024 Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1,738.00 by CK. Receipt Number 30000059. Received from Rob Manly. (admin)

Search for this case: The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: The Fargo Brewing Company, LLC
Represented By: Drew J. Hushka
Represented By: Caren W. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: Robert B. Raschke
Represented By: Sarah J. Wencil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Thomas Kapusta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?