Stark Energy, Inc.
Debtor: Stark Energy, Inc.
Trustee: Thomas Kapusta
Us Trustee: Robert B. Raschke
Case Number: 3:2024bk30168
Filed: April 23, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Shon Hastings
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2024 Trustee's Initial Report & First Meeting Held Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke ( related document(s) Adjourment/Continuation of Meeting of Creditors filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke). (Wencil, Sarah)
June 20, 2024 Filing 90 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#87 Order on Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/20/2024. (Admin.)
June 20, 2024 Filing 89 Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period April 23- May 31, 2024 Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc.. (AHLGREN, ERIK) (Per #8-no bank statements attached) Modified on 6/20/2024 (vck, Court).
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Order Granting an Amended Motion for 2004 Examination of Delen Fettig (Re: #60 Motion and Notice of Rule 2004 Examination ). Signed on 6/18/2024 (vck, Court)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Order Granting Motion for Approval of Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to Section 364(c) of the Bankruptcy Code (Related Doc #39). Signed on 6/18/2024. Attorney Maurice VerStandig or Attorney Erik Ahlgren to serve order (sfh, Court) Modified on 6/18/2024 (sfh, Court).
June 17, 2024 Filing 86 Notice of Filing Proposed Order Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. (RE: related document(s)#39 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Including: Notice of Motion served on 5/24/2024). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (VerStandig, Maurice)
June 15, 2024 Filing 85 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#79 Order to Set Hearing) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/15/2024. (Admin.)
June 14, 2024 Filing 84 Correspondence request to add additional service address on mailing matrix for creditor Justin Bacon. Filed by creditor Justin Bacon. (vck, Court)
June 14, 2024 Filing 83 Notice of Motion, served on 6/14/2024. Filed by Creditor Regions Bank (RE: related document(s)#81 Motion for Relief from Stay and Certificate of Service Fee Amount $199,). Last day to object is 06/28/2024. (Klepperich, Michael)
June 14, 2024 Filing 82 Brief in Support of Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay Filed by Creditor Regions Bank ( related document(s)#81 Motion for Relief From Stay). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D #5 Exhibit E) (Klepperich, Michael)
June 14, 2024 Filing 81 Motion for Relief from Stay and Certificate of Service Fee Amount $199, Filed by Creditor Regions Bank (Klepperich, Michael)
June 14, 2024 Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(# 24-30168) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1552363. Fee amount 199.00. (U.S. Treasury)
June 13, 2024 Filing 80 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/13/2024 9:48:47 AM ]. File Size [ 39213 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:21:42 ]. (admin).
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Scheduling Order Signed on 6/13/2024. Confirmation Hearing to be held on Thursday, 9/5/2024 at 10:00 AM Quentin N. Burdick U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 2nd Floor, 655 1st Ave. N., Fargo, ND 58102. Deadline to file a plan of reorganization: Monday, July 22, 2024. Deadline to submit ballots to accept or reject plan and to file written objections to plan: Wednesday, August 21, 2024. Deadline to file or email to the Court all exhibits in support of confirmation or an objection to confirmation: Friday, August 30, 2024. If the Court receives no timely-filed objections (or if all objections are withdrawn), the Court may confirm the plan without a hearing. Attorney Erik Ahlgren or Attorney Maurice VerStandig to serve scheduling order on all creditors. (sfh, Court)
June 13, 2024 Filing 78 Status Conference in Subchapter V Case Held. APPEARANCES BY: Attorney Maurice VerStandig for Debtor; Attorney Sarah Wencil for United States Trustee; Subchapter V Trustee, Thomas Kapusta; Attorney Caren Stanley for Gate City Bank. TIME OF HEARING: 11:10 to 11:20 a.m. (sfh, Court)
June 13, 2024 Filing 77 Hearing Held On #39 Motion for Approval of Post-Petition Financing filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. APPEARANCES BY: Attorney Maurice VerStandig for Debtor; Attorney Sarah Wencil for United States Trustee; Subhcapter V Trustee, Thomas Kapusta; Attorney Caren Stanley for Gate City Bank. DISPOSITION: For the reasons stated on the record at the hearing on June 13, 2024, the Debtor's Motion for Post-Petition Financing is approved with certain conditions. TIME OF HEARING: 9:58 to 11:10 a.m. (sfh, Court)
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Order Granting Motion by United States Trustee for Attorney Sarah Wencil to Appear By Video Conference at the Status Conference hearing and hearing on Debtor's Motion for Approval of Post-Petition Financing scheduled for Thursday, June 13, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. (Related Doc #75). The latest video conference instructions and the link to join are located at: https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/video-conferences. To test your video conference connection, please submit the form located at https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/VCtestform. Ordered By Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only). Signed on 6/12/2024 (sfh, Court)
June 11, 2024 Filing 75 Motion to Appear By Video Conference (related documents #39 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364) Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke (Wencil, Sarah)
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order Granting Motion by Subchapter V Trustee for Thomas Kapusta to Appear By Video Conference at the hearing on Debtor's Motion for Approval of Post-Petition Financing Scheduled for Thursday, June 13, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. (Related Doc #73). The latest video conference instructions and the link to join are located at: https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/video-conferences. To test your video conference connection, please submit the form located at https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/VCtestform. Ordered By Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only). Signed on 6/11/2024 (sfh, Court)
June 10, 2024 Filing 73 Motion to Appear By Video Conference (related documents #39 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364) Filed by Trustee Thomas Kapusta (Kapusta, Thomas)
June 10, 2024 Filing 72 Application to Employ Maurice B. VerStandig and The Dakota Bankruptcy Firm as Co-Counsel to Erik A. Ahlgren, Esq. and The Ahlgren Law Office, PLLC Including: Notice of Motion served on 6/10/2024 and Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. Last day to object is 06/24/2024. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Maurice VerStandig #2 Notice) (VerStandig, Maurice)
June 7, 2024 Filing 71 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jennifer M Gooss Filed by Creditor Matthew Barrett. (Gooss, Jennifer)
June 7, 2024 Filing 70 Objection to (related document(s): #39 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Including: Notice of Motion served on 5/24/2024 filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc.) Including Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Matthew Barrett (Gooss, Jennifer)
June 6, 2024 Filing 69 Objection to (related document(s): #39 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Including: Notice of Motion served on 5/24/2024 filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc.) Including Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Gate City Bank (Hushka, Drew)
June 5, 2024 Filing 68 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. ( related document(s)#39 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364). (AHLGREN, ERIK)
June 3, 2024 Filing 67 Objection to (related document(s): #39 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Including: Notice of Motion served on 5/24/2024 filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc.) Including Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Thomas Kapusta (Kapusta, Thomas)
June 3, 2024 Filing 66 Notice of Hearing Change. Status Conference Hearing in a Case File Under Subchapter V (Related Doc #11) is rescheduled to 6/13/2024 at 10:00 AM Quentin N. Burdick U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 2nd Floor, 655 1st Ave. N., Fargo, ND 58102. (sfh, Court)
June 3, 2024 Filing 65 Notice of Hearing On #39 Motion for Approval of Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to Sections 364(c) and (d) of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. Hearing to be held on 6/13/2024 at 10:00 AM Quentin N. Burdick U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 2nd Floor, 655 1st Ave. N., Fargo, ND 58102. (sfh, Court)
June 3, 2024 Filing 64 Objection to (related document(s): #39 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Including: Notice of Motion served on 5/24/2024 filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc.) Including Certificate of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke (Wencil, Sarah)
June 3, 2024 Filing 63 Amended Notice of Hearing On #16 Motion to Lift Automatic Stay filed by Gate City Bank. Final Hearing to be held on 7/9/2024 at 10:00 AM Quentin N. Burdick U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 2nd Floor, 655 1st Ave. N., Fargo, ND 58102. The stay will remain in effect and is extended until the Court has an opportunity to consider the matter at the final hearing. (Amended notice to correct hearing date) (sfh, Court)
May 31, 2024 Filing 62 Notice of Hearing On #16 Motion to Lift Automatic Stay filed by Gate City Bank. Final Hearing to be held on 6/27/2024 at 10:00 AM Quentin N. Burdick U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 2nd Floor, 655 1st Ave. N., Fargo, ND 58102. The stay will remain in effect and is extended until the Court has an opportunity to consider the matter at the final hearing. (sfh, Court)
May 31, 2024 Filing 60 Amended Motion for 2004 Examination of Delene Fettig with Exhibits A and B (Re: #45 Motion for Examination) Including: Notice of Motion served on 5/31/2024 and Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Gate City Bank Last day to object is 06/14/2024. (Stanley, Caren) (enhanced docket and added objection deadline) Modified on 6/3/2024 (vck, Court).
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Order Granting Motion for Rule 2004 Examination of Yuker Towing & Repair, LLC (RE: 22 Motion and Notice of Rule 2004 Examination). Signed on 5/31/2024 (mjk, Court)
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Order Granting Motion for Rule 2004 Examination of Andrew Benjamin Yuker (RE: #21 Motion and Notice of Rule 2004 Examination). Signed on 5/31/2024. (mjk, Court)
May 31, 2024 Adjournment/Continuation of Meeting of Creditors Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke. 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/19/2024 at01:30 PM via Telephone conference ONLY. (Wencil, Sarah)
May 30, 2024 Filing 61 Preliminary Hearing Held On #16 Motion to Lift Automatic Stay filed by Creditor Gate City Bank. APPEARANCES BY: Attorney Erik Ahlgren for Debtor; Attorney Caren Stanley and Attorney Drew Hushka for Gate City Bank; Thomas Kapusta, Subchapter V Trustee. DISPOSITION: Final Hearing will be held on Thursday, June 27, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. TIME OF HEARING: 2:08 to 2:42 p.m.. (sfh, Court)
May 30, 2024 Filing 57 Pre-Status Conference Report Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. ( related document(s)#11 Order to Set Status Conference). (AHLGREN, ERIK)
May 30, 2024 Filing 56 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/30/2024 2:08:07 PM ]. File Size [ 16509 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:34:24 ]. (admin).
May 29, 2024 Filing 55 Amended Exhibit List Filed by Creditor Gate City Bank ( related document(s)#16 Motion for Relief From Stay, #50 Exhibit List). (Stanley, Caren)
May 29, 2024 Filing 54 Exhibit M-43 - Death Certificate for Benny Yuker Filed by Creditor Gate City Bank ( related document(s)#16 Motion for Relief From Stay, #50 Exhibit List). (Stanley, Caren)
May 29, 2024 Filing 53 Supplemental Brief Filed by Creditor Gate City Bank ( related document(s)#16 Motion for Relief From Stay). (Stanley, Caren)
May 29, 2024 Filing 52 Affidavit of Matthew Barrett Filed by Creditor Gate City Bank ( related document(s)#16 Motion for Relief From Stay). (Stanley, Caren)
May 28, 2024 Filing 51 Witness List Filed by Creditor Gate City Bank ( related document(s)#16 Motion for Relief From Stay). (Stanley, Caren)
May 28, 2024 Filing 50 Exhibit List Filed by Creditor Gate City Bank ( related document(s)#16 Motion for Relief From Stay). (Stanley, Caren)
May 28, 2024 Filing 49 Affidavit of Kevin Warner Filed by Creditor Gate City Bank ( related document(s)#16 Motion for Relief From Stay). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D #2 Exhibit E - G #3 Exhibit H - I) (Stanley, Caren)
May 28, 2024 Filing 48 Witness List of Debtor Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. (related document(s)#16 Motion for Relief From Stay). (AHLGREN, ERIK). (corrected docket linkage) Modified on 5/29/2024 (mjk, Court).
May 28, 2024 Filing 47 Exhibit List of Debtor Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. (related document(s)#16 Motion for Relief From Stay). (AHLGREN, ERIK). (corrected docket linkage) Modified on 5/29/2024 (mjk, Court).
May 28, 2024 Filing 46 Affidavit of Chris Prochnow Filed by Creditor Gate City Bank ( related document(s)#16 Motion for Relief From Stay). (Stanley, Caren)
May 28, 2024 Filing 45 (SEE Amended Motion filed at #60) Motion for 2004 Examination of Delene Fettig with Exhibits A and B Including: Notice of Motion served on 5/28/2024 and Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Gate City Bank Last day to object is 06/11/2024. (Stanley, Caren) Modified on 5/31/2024 (mjk, Court).
May 28, 2024 Filing 44 Affidavit of Caren W. Stanley Filed by Creditor Gate City Bank ( related document(s)#16 Motion for Relief From Stay). (Stanley, Caren)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order Granting Motion by Subchapter V Trustee for Thomas Kapusta to Appear By Video Conference or Telephonic at the Preliminary Hearing on Gate City Bank's Motion to Lift Automatic Stay scheduled for Thursday, May 30, 2024, at 2:00 p.m. (Related Doc #42). The latest video conference instructions and the link to join are located at: https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/video-conferences. To test your video conference connection, please submit the form located at https://www.ndb.uscourts.gov/VCtestform. Ordered By Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only). Signed on 5/28/2024 (sfh, Court) Modified on 5/28/2024 (sfh, Court).
May 28, 2024 Filing 42 Motion to Appear By Video Conference (related documents #16 Motion for Relief From Stay) Filed by Trustee Thomas Kapusta (Kapusta, Thomas)
May 24, 2024 Filing 41 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. ( related document(s)#39 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364). (AHLGREN, ERIK)
May 24, 2024 Filing 40 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. ( related document(s)#7 Meeting of Creditors Chapter, #33 Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors). (AHLGREN, ERIK)
May 23, 2024 Filing 39 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Including: Notice of Motion served on 5/24/2024 Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. Last day to object is 06/7/2024. (AHLGREN, ERIK)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order Approving Application to Employ Erik A. Ahlgren and Ahlgren Law Office, PLLC. as counsel for Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. effective April 23, 2024 (Related Doc. #4). The application to employ is APPROVED subject to the limitations on compensation provided by 11 U.S.C. 328. This order is not a determination that the services or rates charged are necessary and reasonable. The person or entity employed under this order shall file a fee application in accordance with the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedures. See Fed. R. Bank. P. 2016, 2017 and 11 U.S.C. 329, 330. Applicant must also comply with Local Rules. As required by applicable federal rule or statute, the Movant shall serve this docket text only order on all appropriate parties that will not receive notice of electronic filing. By Judge Shon Hastings (Text order only). Signed on 5/22/2024 (vck, Court)
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order Denying in Part Motion to Continue Hearing filed by Gate City Bank (Related Doc #32). The Court will hold a preliminary hearing on Gate City Bank's Motion to Lift Automatic Stay (Doc. #16) on May 30, 2024, at 2:00 p.m. as originally scheduled. At this hearing, the court will hear evidence and argument regarding the status of the collateral location, Movants concerns regarding adequate protection until final hearing on the motion and Debtors response and proposal regarding adequate protection. Ordered by Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only). Signed on 5/21/2024 (sfh, Court)
May 21, 2024 Filing 36 Response to (related document(s): #16 Motion for Relief from Stay Including: Notice of Motion served on 5/1/2024 and Certificate of Service Fee Amount $199, filed by Creditor Gate City Bank, #32 Motion to Continue Hearing On (related documents #16 Motion for Relief From Stay) filed by Creditor Gate City Bank, #34 Objection filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc.) and Affidavit in Support Including Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Gate City Bank (Stanley, Caren)
May 21, 2024 Filing 35 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. ( related document(s)#33 Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors). (AHLGREN, ERIK)
May 21, 2024 Filing 34 Objection to (related document(s): #32 Motion to Continue Hearing On (related documents #16 Motion for Relief From Stay) filed by Creditor Gate City Bank) Including Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. (AHLGREN, ERIK)
May 20, 2024 Filing 33 Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc.. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/30/2024 at03:00 PM via Telephone conference ONLY. (AHLGREN, ERIK)
May 20, 2024 Filing 32 Motion to Continue Hearing On (related documents #16 Motion for Relief From Stay) Filed by Creditor Gate City Bank (Stanley, Caren)
May 20, 2024 Filing 31 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc.. (AHLGREN, ERIK)
May 20, 2024 Filing 30 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. ( related document(s)#7 Meeting of Creditors Chapter). (AHLGREN, ERIK)
May 20, 2024 Filing 29 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. ( related document(s)#11 Order to Set Status Conference). (AHLGREN, ERIK)
May 20, 2024 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Request for Notices Only) Including: Certificate of Service by Kenneth D. Peters Filed by Creditor Alliance Funding Group. (Peters, Kenneth)
May 20, 2024 Additional Creditor (Fee) Fee Amount $34 Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc.. (AHLGREN, ERIK)
May 20, 2024 Receipt of Additional Creditor (Fee)(# 24-30168) [misc,amdcm] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1545780. Fee amount 34.00. (U.S. Treasury)
May 17, 2024 Filing 27 Amended Voluntary Petition (NAICS # and Bar ID #) with attached Form 416B; Amended List of 20 Largest Unsecured Claims, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules, Schedules A-H, Statement of Financial Affairs, Updated Creditor Matrix. Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. (AHLGREN, ERIK) (Enhanced docket; Requested Certificate of Service on added creditors and Attorney Disclosure) Modified on 5/20/2024 (vck, Court).
May 17, 2024 Filing 26 Notice of Hearing by Video Conference On #16 Motion to Lift Automatic Stay filed by Gate City Bank. Final Hearing to be held on 5/30/2024 at 02:00 PM Quentin N. Burdick U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 2nd Floor, 655 1st Ave. N., Fargo, ND 58102. (sfh, Court)
May 15, 2024 Filing 25 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. ( related document(s)#7 Meeting of Creditors Chapter). (AHLGREN, ERIK)
May 15, 2024 Filing 24 Objection to (related document(s): #16 Motion for Relief from Stay Including: Notice of Motion served on 5/1/2024 and Certificate of Service Fee Amount $199, filed by Creditor Gate City Bank) Including Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. (AHLGREN, ERIK)
May 10, 2024 Filing 23 Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Gate City Bank ( related document(s)#21 Notice of Rule 2004 Examination, #22 Notice of Rule 2004 Examination). (Stanley, Caren)
May 10, 2024 Filing 22 Motion and Notice of Rule 2004 Examination of Yuker Towing & Repair, LLC Filed by Creditor Gate City Bank. Last day to object is 5/24/2024. (Stanley, Caren) (enhanced docket/added objection deadline) Modified on 5/13/2024 (vck, Court).
May 10, 2024 Filing 21 Motion and Notice of Rule 2004 Examination of Andrew Benjamin Yuker Filed by Creditor Gate City Bank. Last day to object is 5/24/2024. (Stanley, Caren) (enhanced docket/added objection deadline) Modified on 5/13/2024 (vck, Court).
May 8, 2024 Filing 20 Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. ( related document(s)#7 Meeting of Creditors Chapter). (AHLGREN, ERIK)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Statements, Schedules, and Lists (Related Doc #18). Date Extended to: May 17, 2024. Ordered by Judge Shon Hastings (Text order only). Signed on 5/3/2024 (mjk, Court)
May 3, 2024 Filing 18 Motion to Extend Time to file schedules and statements Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. (AHLGREN, ERIK)
May 1, 2024 Filing 17 BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: related document(s)#11 Order to Set Status Conference) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/01/2024. (Admin.)
May 1, 2024 Filing 16 Motion for Relief from Stay Including: Notice of Motion served on 5/1/2024 and Certificate of Service Fee Amount $199, Filed by Creditor Gate City Bank Last day to object is 05/15/2024. (Stanley, Caren)
May 1, 2024 Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(# 24-30168) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1542605. Fee amount 199.00. (U.S. Treasury)
April 30, 2024 Filing 15 Small Business Balance Sheet Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. ( related document(s) 3 Chapter 11 Small Business Deadlines). (AHLGREN, ERIK)
April 30, 2024 Filing 14 Statement of Operations for Small Business, Small Business Cash Flow Statement Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. ( related document(s) 3 Chapter 11 Small Business Deadlines). (AHLGREN, ERIK)
April 30, 2024 Filing 13 Small Business Federal Income Tax Documents for the Year for 2020 Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. ( related document(s) 3 Chapter 11 Small Business Deadlines). (AHLGREN, ERIK)
April 29, 2024 Filing 12 Copy of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition emailed to Securities and Exchange Commission at denver@sec.gov (RE: #1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc.) (vck, Court)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Setting Telephonic Status Conference in a Case Filed Under Subchapter V Signed on 4/29/2024. Telephonic Hearing to be held on 6/13/2024 at 01:30 PM. Pre-Status Conference Report Due By 5/30/2024. Attorney Erik Ahlgren to serve order on interested parties. (sfh, Court)
April 26, 2024 Filing 10 Creditors Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Ally Bank, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LLC. (Sharma, Amitkumar)
April 25, 2024 Filing 9 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. (RE: related document(s)#7 Meeting of Creditors Chapter) No. of Notices: 24. Notice Date 04/25/2024. (Admin.)
April 23, 2024 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Caren W. Stanley Filed by Creditor Gate City Bank. (Stanley, Caren)
April 23, 2024 Filing 7 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/30/2024 at 02:00 PM via Telephone conference ONLY. Toll free: 866-821-5980, Participant # 9065076. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/29/2024. Proofs of Claim due by 7/2/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/21/2024. (vck, Court)
April 23, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Caren W. Stanley Filed by Creditor Gate City Bank. (Stanley, Caren)
April 23, 2024 Filing 5 Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee . Thomas Kapusta added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke. (Raschke, Robert)
April 23, 2024 Filing 4 Application to Employ Erik A. Ahlgren and Ahlgren Law Office, PLLC as Debtor's Attorney Including: Notice of Motion served on 4/23/2024 and Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Stark Energy, Inc. Last day to object is 05/14/2024. (AHLGREN, ERIK) (updated objection period to 21 days) Modified on 4/23/2024 (vck, Court).
April 23, 2024 Filing 3 Chapter 11 Small Business Deadlines SB Statement of Operations Due: 4/30/2024. SB Balance Sheet: 4/30/2024. Tax Return Deadline: 4/30/2024. SB Cash Flow Statement: 4/30/2024. (vck, Court)
April 23, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Including: Certificate of Service by Sarah J. Wencil Filed by U.S. Trustee Robert B. Raschke. (Wencil, Sarah)
April 23, 2024 Filing 1 Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition Non-Individual, List of Creditors Who Have The 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders, Corporate Ownership Statement. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by ERIK A. AHLGREN on behalf of Stark Energy, Inc. Atty Disclosure Statement due 05/7/2024. Declaration About Debtors Schedules due 05/7/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 05/7/2024. Schedule A/B due 05/7/2024. Schedule C due 05/7/2024. Schedule D due 05/7/2024. Schedule E/F due 05/7/2024. Schedule G due 05/7/2024. Schedule H due 05/7/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 05/7/2024. Summary of assets and liabilities due 05/7/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 05/7/2024. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 07/22/2024. (AHLGREN, ERIK) (enhanced docket; removed incorrect deadlines) Modified on 4/23/2024 (vck, Court).
April 23, 2024 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 24-30168) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1540665. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: Stark Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Stark Energy, Inc.
Represented By: ERIK A. AHLGREN
Represented By: Maurice VerStandig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Thomas Kapusta
Represented By: Thomas Kapusta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: Robert B. Raschke
Represented By: Sarah J. Wencil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?