North Dakota Department of Human Services v. Center for Special Needs Trust Administration, Inc et al
Plaintiff: North Dakota Department of Human Services
Defendant: Center for Special Needs Trust Administration, Inc and Damian J Huettle
Case Number: 1:2009cv00077
Filed: November 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1396 Tort Negligence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Remand; finding as moot 17 Motion for Summary Judgment (RAB)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 11/4/2010 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/2010 at 09:00 AM in by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. (MM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Dakota Department of Human Services v. Center for Special Needs Trust Administration, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Dakota Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center for Special Needs Trust Administration, Inc
Represented By: Gregory C. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damian J Huettle
Represented By: Gregory C. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?