Zuffa LLC v. Kamranian et al
Plaintiff: Zuffa LLC
Defendant: Reza T Kamranian and Kamranian Inc
Counter_claimant: Reza T Kamranian and Kamranian Inc
Counter_defendant: Zuffa LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv00036
Filed: April 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Determining Damages and for Entry of Judgment. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER re submission of the parties' closing arguments. Parties' written summaries of their respective closing arguments are due by 11/14/2013. Thereafter, each party shall have 5 days to submit a response to the other's argument. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER adopting 88 Stipulation to Use of Video Conference Technology at Bench Trial. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 29 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 59 Motion for Summary Judgment. The issue of a damages and other relief that may be appropriate is reserved for the courts future consideration. (BG)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 17 Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaim. (BG)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 1 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Julie Cohen Lonstein. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zuffa LLC v. Kamranian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reza T Kamranian
Represented By: Charles L. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamranian Inc
Represented By: Charles L. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zuffa LLC
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Reza T Kamranian
Represented By: Charles L. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Kamranian Inc
Represented By: Charles L. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Zuffa LLC
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?