Little Bear v. Silk et al

Plaintiff: Conrad Little Bear
Defendant: Earl Silk, BIA and Ken Salazar
Case Number: 1:2011cv00103
Filed: December 23, 2011
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Sioux
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re dismissal of action unless a paid complaint is filed on or before 4/15/2015. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 3/20/2015 (jt).
April 24, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of dismissal without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 4/24/2015. (rh)
June 22, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff shall have until 9/17/2012 to file an amended complaint. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(BG) Distributed on 6/22/2012. (rm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little Bear v. Silk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conrad Little Bear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Silk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.