Pacific West Site Services, Inc. v. Vesci

Plaintiff: Pacific West Site Services, Inc.
Defendant: Gary Robert Vesci
Case Number: 1:2013cv00036
Filed: March 19, 2013
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Stark
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2015 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference REset for 4/26/2016 at 3:00 PM CT by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Previouly set for 11/23/2015. Jury Trial REset for 5/9/2016 at 9:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel L. Hovland (5 days, #2 on civil calendar) (Previously set for 12/07/2015). By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
July 8, 2015 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 113 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Danny D. Brace, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 7/8/2015 (jt).
May 5, 2015 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting in part and denying in part 97 Motion for Sanctions. (KT)
March 17, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff granted leave to file a motion for sanction by 3/23/2015. Defendant's response is due by 3/30/2015. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 29, 2015 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting/granting 83 Stipulation/Joint Motion to Extend Case Deadlines. Discovery due by 3/6/2015. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 3/17/2015. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 5/1/2015. Disp ositive Motions due by 6/15/2015. Final Pretrial Conference REset for 11/23/2015 at 3:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. (Previously set for 9/29/2015). Jury Trial REset for 12/7/2015 at 9:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel L. Hovland (7 days) (Previously set for 10/13/2015). By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Modified on 1/29/2015 to correct date of Dispositive Motions in docket text. Regenerated NEF. (rh)
January 27, 2015 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 84 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William R. Warne. (BG)
May 28, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Extending Discovery Deadline: Discovery due by 9/1/2014. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
May 23, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.granting 70 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ruth E. Hartman. (KT) NEF regenerated to Hartman on 5/23/2014. (rm)
April 30, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 68 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael L. Shoff. (BG) NEF regenerated to PHV attorney Michael L. Shoff (lf).
November 21, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/24/2015 at 01:30 PM CST by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
October 1, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
April 26, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robin K. Perkins. (BG) NEF regenerated to Perkins on 4/26/2013. (rm)
March 28, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edmund Searby; granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Darren Crook. (BG) NEF regenerated to Searby and Crook on 3/28/2013. (rm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific West Site Services, Inc. v. Vesci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific West Site Services, Inc.
Represented By: Brenda Lynn Blazer
Represented By: Darren A. Crook
Represented By: Amanda E. Peterson
Represented By: Edmund W. Searby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Robert Vesci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?