Harker v. Harvie's Hot Shot Service and Trucking, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jason R. Harker
Defendant: Harvie's Hot Shot Service and Trucking, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00038
Filed: April 9, 2014
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Williams
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/21/2014 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
July 17, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thane Johnson. (KT) NEF regenerated to Johnson on 7/17/2014. (rm)
July 21, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2015 at 02:30 PM CDT by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
March 2, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 34 Joint Motion for Stipulated Order in Limine. (BG)
April 9, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bradley L. Booke; granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert P. Schuster. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harker v. Harvie's Hot Shot Service and Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason R. Harker
Represented By: Bradley L. Booke
Represented By: James R Hoy
Represented By: David S. Maring
Represented By: Robert P. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvie's Hot Shot Service and Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.