Leland Oil & Gas, LLC et al v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: Leland Oil & Gas, LLC and K and R Roustabout, Inc.
Defendant: Marsha Azar and Saul Azar
Case Number: 1:2014cv00161
Filed: December 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Dunn
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 80 Motion to Vacate; denying 87 Motion for Hearing. (BG)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER re return of trial exhibits. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 43 granting 41 Motion for Default Judgment.(MM)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 35 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (BG)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 41 Motion For Default Judgment Against Defendant Bensun Energy, LLC (Second). By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; adopting 38 Report and Recommendations; denying 26 Motion for Default Judgment by Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(MM)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2016 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2015 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Marsha Azar and Saul Azar shall have until 4/13/2015 to file an answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leland Oil & Gas, LLC et al v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leland Oil & Gas, LLC
Represented By: Shawn A. Grinolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K and R Roustabout, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn A. Grinolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saul Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?