Tank Connection, LLC v. Olander Contracting Co. et al
Plaintiff: Tank Connection, LLC
Defendant: Olander Contracting Co. and Western Surety Company
Case Number: 1:2015cv00038
Filed: April 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Stark
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: The final pretrial conference set for February 27, 2017, and the trial set for March 13, 2017, are cancelled. Status report due by 3/31/2017. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER adopting 45 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: Discovery due by 12/1/2016. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 12/15/2016. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 1/20/2017. Final Pretrial Conference REset for 2/27/2017 at 1:30 PM in by telepho ne before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Previously set for 2/21/2017). Jury Trial REset for 3/13/2017 at 1:30 PM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel L. Hovland (5 day) (Previously set for 3/7/2017). By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: The principals shall meet and confer within the next 45 days to discuss a possible resolution of this matter. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2017 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2015 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Holly M. Perkins. (BG)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The order granting attorney Ross A. Hollander leave to appear pro hac vice on defendants' behalf is vacated. Attorney Ross A. Hollander is granted leave to appear pro hac vice on plaintiff's behalf by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed to Hollander on 4/28/2015.(rm)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ross A. Hollander. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tank Connection, LLC v. Olander Contracting Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tank Connection, LLC
Represented By: Randall J. Bakke
Represented By: Ross A. Hollander
Represented By: Bradley Neuman Wiederholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olander Contracting Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?