Sander v. Dickinson et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Sander
Defendant: Dickinson, City of, Kylan Klauzer, Jeremy Moser, Terry Oestreich and Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2015cv00072
Filed: June 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Stark
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 AMENDED ORDER granting in part and denying in part 57 MOTION to Compel. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion to Compel. (BG)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER re 57 MOTION to Compel Information and Items Withheld Under Investigative Privilege filed by Thomas Sander by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Defendants are to file all documents and materials for which they claim investigative privilege under seal with the court for in camera review within ten (10) days).(ZE)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 7/26/2016 at 9:00 AM CT in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert L. Stepans. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sander v. Dickinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Sander
Represented By: Ryan R. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dickinson, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kylan Klauzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Oestreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?