Leiss v. North Dakota Lottery.Gov et al

Plaintiff: Curtis B. Leiss
Defendant: North Dakota Lottery.Gov and Randy Miller
Case Number: 1:2015cv00121
Filed: September 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Southwestern Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. finding as moot 11 Motion to Stay. (BG) Distributed on 10/2/2015. (rh)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 9 Motion for Reconsideration. (BG) Distributed on 9/16/2015. (mk)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of dismissal of 6 Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 9/10/2015. (rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leiss v. North Dakota Lottery.Gov et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis B. Leiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Dakota Lottery.Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?