Running Horse, LLC v. Rodenbough Trucking & Excavating, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Running Horse, LLC
Defendant: Rodenbough Trucking & Excavating, Inc., Jessie Rodenbough and Matthew Rodenbough
Case Number: 1:2016cv00035
Filed: February 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Ward
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER: Rodenbough Trucking & Excavating, Inc., Jessie Rodenbough, and Matthew Rodenbough shall make themselves available for depositions in Bismarck, North Dakota, during the week of July 16, 2018. Additionally, they shall make equipment available for inspection by plaintiff in the Idaho Falls, Idaho, area on June 18, 2018. ByMagistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(BG) Distributed on 6/5/2018 (cjs).
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/4/2018 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 5/29/2018 (cjs).
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting 203 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alan Johnston, Paul D. Ziel, and Belinda Tanner. (ZE) Copy of Order mailed to PHV attorneys and distributed to pro se parties on 12/13/2017 (cjs).
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 11/27/2017 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. The undersigned shall first contact plaintiff and then follow up defendants. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(BG) Distributed on 11/17/2017. (cd)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER vacating 184 Order by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE) Distributed on 8/10/2017 (cd).
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER re 146 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Tesha Fredericks by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE) Distributed on 8/8/2017 (rh).
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 3/7/2017 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(ZE)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr denying 54 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. (ZE)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr finding as moot 38 Motion for Discovery Prior to Rule 26 Scheduling Conference; finding as moot 53 Motion for Discovery Prior to Rule 26 Scheduling Conference. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Running Horse, LLC v. Rodenbough Trucking & Excavating, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Running Horse, LLC
Represented By: William C. Ferebee
Represented By: Jason L. Frazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodenbough Trucking & Excavating, Inc.
Represented By: Amy L. De Kok
Represented By: David R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessie Rodenbough
Represented By: Amy L. De Kok
Represented By: David R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Rodenbough
Represented By: Amy L. De Kok
Represented By: David R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?