Curtiss v. Braun

Petitioner: Spencer Kerry Curtiss
Respondent: Colby Braun
Case Number: 1:2016cv00049
Filed: March 11, 2016
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Western Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2018 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for filing of additional parts of state court record by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 3/29/2018 (cjs).
March 13, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for filing of additional parts of state court record. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 3/13/2018 (cjs). (Main Document 23 replaced on 3/13/2018 to correct error in document. Regenerated NEF and redistributed.) (rh)
August 29, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 8 Motion to Stay; denying 18 Motion to Amend/Correct Petition. (BG) Distributed on 8/29/2016. (rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtiss v. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Spencer Kerry Curtiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Colby Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?