Avery et al v. Ward
Plaintiff: Kevin A. Avery and Denise M. Avery
Defendant: John E. Ward
Case Number: 1:2016cv00055
Filed: March 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dennis P. Wilkinson. (BG) Distributed to pro se party and regenerated NEF to Attorney Wilkinson on 2/12/2018. (rh)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Amended to correct date of bench trial. (ZE) Distributed on 11/15/2017 (cjs).
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND ORDER FOR JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Distributed on 11/14/2017. (cd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avery et al v. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin A. Avery
Represented By: Bradley L. Booke
Represented By: James R Hoy
Represented By: David S. Maring
Represented By: Robert P. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise M. Avery
Represented By: Bradley L. Booke
Represented By: James R Hoy
Represented By: David S. Maring
Represented By: Robert P. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?