Target Logistics Management, LLC et al v. Williston, City of

Plaintiff: Target Logistics Management, LLC and Lodging Solutions - Williston, LLC
Defendant: Williston, City of
Case Number: 1:2016cv00076
Filed: April 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Williams
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2019 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting 84 Motion to Intervene. (RLB)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER adopting 81 Stipulation for Stay and Termination of Deadlines. All pretrial deadlines are suspended and the case is stayed pending further order of the court. A Status Conference is set for 11/20/2017 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/2018 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2016 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian Wells; granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Benjamin Tymann. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Target Logistics Management, LLC et al v. Williston, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Target Logistics Management, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas C. Grant
Represented By: Randall N. Sickler
Represented By: Benjamin B. Tymann
Represented By: Brian K. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lodging Solutions - Williston, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas C. Grant
Represented By: Randall N. Sickler
Represented By: Benjamin B. Tymann
Represented By: Brian K. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williston, City of
Represented By: Scott K. Porsborg
Represented By: Preston James Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?