Chan v. Mercy Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Kimson Chan
Defendant: Mercy Medical Center and Jordan Lee Bales, MD
Case Number: 1:2016cv00088
Filed: April 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Williams
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The final pretrial conference set for 2/20/2018 and jury trial set for 3/06/2018 are canceled. They shall be rescheduled once this case has been reassigned. The 11 MOTION Leave to Take Video Trial Deposition and 12 Request to expedite are deemed MOOT. The parties may take the video deposition at an agreeable time. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Modified on 1/30/2018 to correct date of final pretrial conference. Regenerated NEF. (rh)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2018 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2016 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chan v. Mercy Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimson Chan
Represented By: Alan Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercy Medical Center
Represented By: Courtney A. Presthus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Lee Bales, MD
Represented By: Michael C. Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?