Cotter v. Waste Management of North Dakota, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Patrick Cotter
Defendant: Waste Management of North Dakota, Inc. and Command Center, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00097
Filed: April 29, 2016
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Western Office
County: Williams
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 54 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Waste Management of North Dakota, Inc. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)
October 31, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2018 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 3, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2016 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 26, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting Stipulation by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(ZE)
July 21, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Clerk's office shall seal Exhibit A attached to the 23 Affidavit filed by Command Center, Inc. Command Center, Inc. shall file a redacted Exhibit A. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cotter v. Waste Management of North Dakota, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Cotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Management of North Dakota, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Command Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?