Western Energy Alliance et al v. U.S. Department of the Interior et al
Plaintiff: Western Energy Alliance and North Dakota Petroleum Council
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior, Sally Jewell, Bureau of Land Management, Neil Kornze, U.S. Department of Agriculture, Tom Vilsack, U.S. Forest Service and Thomas L. Tidwell
Case Number: 1:2016cv00112
Filed: May 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting 64 Motion to Stay. Case shall be stayed for ninety (90) days. Status report due by 10/6/2017. (ZE)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 52 Motion to Withdraw as Amici Curiae by Idaho Power Company and PacifiCorp. (BG)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2016 at 10:00 AM CDT by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Laurence Michael Bogert. (BG) Regenerated to Attorney Laurence Michael Bogert on 7/15/2016. (rh)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason T. Morgan; granting 25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Beth S. Ginsberg. (BG) Regenerated to Attorneys Morgan and Ginsberg on 7/14/2016. (rh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Energy Alliance et al v. U.S. Department of the Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Energy Alliance
Represented By: Malinda Morain
Represented By: Theresa Michelle Sauer
Represented By: Bret A Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Dakota Petroleum Council
Represented By: Malinda Morain
Represented By: Theresa Michelle Sauer
Represented By: Bret A Sumner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior
Represented By: Luke Hajek
Represented By: Barclay Thomas Samford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Jewell
Represented By: Luke Hajek
Represented By: Barclay Thomas Samford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Luke Hajek
Represented By: Barclay Thomas Samford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Kornze
Represented By: Luke Hajek
Represented By: Barclay Thomas Samford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Luke Hajek
Represented By: Barclay Thomas Samford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Vilsack
Represented By: Luke Hajek
Represented By: Barclay Thomas Samford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Forest Service
Represented By: Luke Hajek
Represented By: Barclay Thomas Samford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas L. Tidwell
Represented By: Luke Hajek
Represented By: Barclay Thomas Samford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?