North Dakota Farm Bureau, Inc. et al v. Attorney General of North Dakota

Plaintiff: North Dakota Farm Bureau, Inc., Galegher Farms, Inc., Brian Gerrits and Breeze Dairy Group, LLC
Defendant: Attorney General of North Dakota
Case Number: 1:2016cv00137
Filed: June 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Burleigh
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 93 Motion to Strike ; denying 104 Motion to Dismiss; denying 113 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (MM)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER: All pretrial deadlines are suspended pending further order of the court. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting 103 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling/Discovery Plan. Discovery due by 3/20/2018. Discovery Motions due by 4/17/2018. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 3/30/2018. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosu res and Reports due by 5/15/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2018. Bench Trial REset for 4/2/2019 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (9 days). Final Pretrial Conference REset for 3/26/2019 at 2:00 PM in by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Final Pretrial conference previously set for 2/15/2019; Bench Trial previously set for 2/19/2019). (BG)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/15/2019 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(ZE)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2017 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Scheduling conference scheduled for 11/10/16 is cancelled and will be scheduled for a later date.(ZE)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/10/2016 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. The court will initiate the conference call.(ZE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Dakota Farm Bureau, Inc. et al v. Attorney General of North Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Dakota Farm Bureau, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Andrews Herman
Represented By: Claire Louise Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galegher Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Andrews Herman
Represented By: Claire Louise Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Gerrits
Represented By: Sarah Andrews Herman
Represented By: Claire Louise Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breeze Dairy Group, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Andrews Herman
Represented By: Claire Louise Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of North Dakota
Represented By: Joseph P. Bialke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?