Chabert et al v. Bujaldon et al

Plaintiff: Chabert, Stephane Perrotte, Jean Pierre Dessaint, Knet LLC, Thysolau LLC, Raymond Chabert, Marcus LLC, Jean-Claude Jacquet, PLTH Montana, LLC, Luc-Oliver Laleve, Quintal Montana Invest LLC, Ernard Perrotte, Gabriel & Dessaint LLC, Thierry Dutheil, PLTH Dakota, LLC, Pierre Thuillier, Jean-Yves Derault, Berjo Montana LLC, Eric Gabriel and Jean-Louis Pepin
Defendant: Bujaldon, Michael Francois Bujaldon, Big3 Property LLC, VM Invest LLC and JMI IMMO Invest LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv00293
Filed: August 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
2 Judge: Charles S Miller
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (Change as to Judge only). (kmk)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr no longer assigned to the case, as referral judge. (kmk)
January 4, 2019 Filing 100 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Michael Francois Bujaldon. (cjs)
January 4, 2019 Filing 99 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Michael Francois Bujaldon by Berjo Montana LLC, Raymond Chabert, Jean-Yves Derault, Jean Pierre Dessaint, Thierry Dutheil, Eric Gabriel, Gabriel & Dessaint LLC, Jean-Claude Jacquet, Knet LLC, Luc-Oliver Laleve, Marcus LLC, PLTH Dakota, LLC, PLTH Montana, LLC, Jean-Louis Pepin, Ernard Perrotte, Stephane Perrotte, Quintal Montana Invest LLC, Pierre Thuillier, Thysolau LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Attorney Mac Schneider in Support of Motion for Entry of Default Against Michael Francois Bujaldon, #2 Proposed Entry of Default as to Defendant Michael Francois Bujaldon)(Schneider, McLain) Modified on 1/4/2019 to remove excess docket text cjs).
July 12, 2018 Filing 98 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.: Early Settlement Conference held on 7/12/2018. Parties reached an agreement in principle. (BG)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER: Early Settlement Conference set for 7/12/2018 at 8:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
June 18, 2018 Filing 96 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 2/18/2020 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (9 days). (BG)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Discovery due by 3/1/2019. Discovery Motions due by 3/1/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 4/1/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 5/1/2019. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 5/20/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 11/1/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2018, except amendments re punitive damages due by 2/1/2019. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 11/1/2018. Threshold Motions due by 12/1/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2019.(BG)
June 18, 2018 Filing 93 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 6/18/2018. (BG)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 (Text Only) ORDER granting #91 MOTION for an extension of time to file a proposed scheduling and discovery Plan and extend all deadlines by 15 days. Scheduling Conference REset for 6/18/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. The court will initiate the conference call. The parties should email a proposed scheduling and discovery plan to chambers at least 2 days prior to the conference. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller. (BG) Modified on 6/1/2018 to note previously set for 6/1/18 (lh).
May 30, 2018 Filing 91 MOTION for Hearing Third Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order by Big3 Property LLC. (Raum, Michael)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 (Text Only) ORDER granting #89 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan and extend all deadlines by an additional 30 days. Scheduling Conference REset for 6/1/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. The court will initiate the conference call. The parties should email a proposed scheduling and discovery plan to chambers at least 2 days prior to the conference. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
April 27, 2018 Filing 89 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan and extend all deadlines by an additional 30 days by Berjo Montana LLC, Raymond Chabert, Jean-Yves Derault, Jean Pierre Dessaint, Thierry Dutheil, Eric Gabriel, Gabriel & Dessaint LLC, Jean-Claude Jacquet, Knet LLC, Luc-Oliver Laleve, Marcus LLC, PLTH Dakota, LLC, PLTH Montana, LLC, Jean-Louis Pepin, Ernard Perrotte, Stephane Perrotte, Quintal Montana Invest LLC, Pierre Thuillier, Thysolau LLC. (Schneider, McLain)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 (Text Only) ORDER granting #87 MOTION to Amend/Correct #86 Order. Scheduling Conference REset for 5/1/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. The court will initiate the conference call. The parties should email a proposed scheduling and discovery plan to chambers at least 2 days prior to the conference. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Conference previously set for 3/1/2018) (BG)
February 26, 2018 Filing 87 MOTION to Amend/Correct #86 Order, Set Hearings by Big3 Property LLC. (Raum, Michael)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/1/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 4, 2017 Filing 85 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pierre Thuillier, Thierry Dutheil, Luc-Oliver Laleve, Jean Pierre Dessaint, Berjo Montana LLC, Jean-Claude Jacquet, Raymond Chabert, Knet LLC, Thysolau LLC, Jean-Louis Pepin, Stephane Perrotte, Quintal Montana Invest LLC, PLTH Montana, LLC, Gabriel & Dessaint LLC, Eric Gabriel, PLTH Dakota, LLC, Ernard Perrotte, Marcus LLC, Jean-Yves Derault. Michael Francois Bujaldon served on 9/19/2017, answer due 10/10/2017 (Schneider, McLain)
November 2, 2017 Filing 84 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to JMI IMMO Invest LLC, VM Invest LLC. (lf) (Main Document 84 replaced on 11/2/2017 to correct case number. NEF regenerated.) (lf) (Main Document 84 replaced on 11/6/2017 to correct date signed and date filed to match the date default was entered. NEF Regenerated.) (as)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland finding as moot #57 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying #63 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; and finding as moot 66 Motion for Hearing. (RLB)
May 11, 2017 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #82 Motion for Default Judgment. Corrected motion relief from Motion for Default Judgment to Motion for Entry of Default. (lh)
May 9, 2017 Filing 82 MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendants VM Invest, LLC and JMI IMMO Invest, LLC by Berjo Montana LLC, Raymond Chabert, Jean-Yves Derault, Jean Pierre Dessaint, Thierry Dutheil, Eric Gabriel, Gabriel & Dessaint LLC, Jean-Claude Jacquet, Knet LLC, Luc-Oliver Laleve, Marcus LLC, PLTH Dakota, LLC, PLTH Montana, LLC, Jean-Louis Pepin, Ernard Perrotte, Stephane Perrotte, Quintal Montana Invest LLC, Pierre Thuillier, Thysolau LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default, #2 Proposed Entry of Default)(Schneider, McLain) Modified on 5/11/2017 to correct motion relief (lh).
May 9, 2017 Filing 81 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed) as to #62 Summons Issued, #61 Amended Complaint, filed by Pierre Thuillier, Thierry Dutheil, Luc-Oliver Laleve, Jean Pierre Dessaint, Berjo Montana LLC, Jean-Claude Jacquet, Raymond Chabert, Knet LLC, Thysolau LLC, Jean-Louis Pepin, Stephane Perrotte, Quintal Montana Invest LLC, PLTH Montana, LLC, Gabriel & Dessaint LLC, Eric Gabriel, PLTH Dakota, LLC, Ernard Perrotte, Marcus LLC, Jean-Yves Derault. JMI IMMO Invest LLC served on 2/15/2017, answer due 3/8/2017. (Schneider, McLain) Modified on 5/11/2017 to clarify event (lh).
April 4, 2017 Filing 80 SURREPLY to #63 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Request for Oral Argument filed by Berjo Montana LLC, Raymond Chabert, Jean-Yves Derault, Jean Pierre Dessaint, Thierry Dutheil, Eric Gabriel, Gabriel & Dessaint LLC, Jean-Claude Jacquet, Knet LLC, Luc-Oliver Laleve, Marcus LLC, PLTH Dakota, LLC, PLTH Montana, LLC, Jean-Louis Pepin, Ernard Perrotte, Stephane Perrotte, Quintal Montana Invest LLC, Pierre Thuillier, Thysolau LLC. (Schneider, McLain)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 (Text Only) ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #78 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Surreply due 4/10/2017. (QH)
April 3, 2017 Filing 78 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Berjo Montana LLC, Raymond Chabert, Jean-Yves Derault, Jean Pierre Dessaint, Thierry Dutheil, Eric Gabriel, Gabriel & Dessaint LLC, Jean-Claude Jacquet, Knet LLC, Luc-Oliver Laleve, Marcus LLC, PLTH Dakota, LLC, PLTH Montana, LLC, Jean-Louis Pepin, Ernard Perrotte, Stephane Perrotte, Quintal Montana Invest LLC, Pierre Thuillier, Thysolau LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sur-Reply)(Booker, James)
March 27, 2017 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #76 BRIEF. Wrong event selected. Clerks office restricted access to document and re-filed as REPLY to Response to Motion at #77 ; #76 BRIEF. Clerks office removed link to document #67 . Responses and Replies should be linked back to the Motions they are responding or replying to. (js)
March 24, 2017 Filing 77 REPLY to Response to Motion re #63 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Request for Oral Argument, re 66 MOTION for Hearing filed by Big3 Property LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pierre LeBlanc, #2 Declaration (Third) of Ilivier Claeys)(js)
March 24, 2017 Filing 76 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* BRIEF re #67 Response to Motion. Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Big3 Property LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Pierre LeBlanc, #2 Exhibit (Third) Declaration of Olivier Claeys)(Raum, Michael) Modified on 3/27/2017 to restrict access. (js)
March 21, 2017 Filing 75 NOTICE by Berjo Montana LLC, Raymond Chabert, Jean-Yves Derault, Jean Pierre Dessaint, Thierry Dutheil, Eric Gabriel, Gabriel & Dessaint LLC, Jean-Claude Jacquet, Knet LLC, Luc-Oliver Laleve, Marcus LLC, PLTH Dakota, LLC, PLTH Montana, LLC, Jean-Louis Pepin, Ernard Perrotte, Stephane Perrotte, Quintal Montana Invest LLC, Pierre Thuillier, Thysolau LLC re #67 Response to Motion,,, certified, translated copies of emails included in Plaintiffs' declarations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Emails from Stephane Perrottes Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Emails from Thierry Dutheils Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Emails from Jean-Claude Jacquets Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Emails from Pierre Thuilliers Declaration)(Schneider, McLain)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 (Text Only) ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #73 Motion for Leave to File (MM)
March 20, 2017 Filing 73 MOTION for Leave to File Translated Documents by Berjo Montana LLC, Raymond Chabert, Jean-Yves Derault, Jean Pierre Dessaint, Thierry Dutheil, Eric Gabriel, Gabriel & Dessaint LLC, Jean-Claude Jacquet, Knet LLC, Luc-Oliver Laleve, Marcus LLC, PLTH Dakota, LLC, PLTH Montana, LLC, Jean-Louis Pepin, Ernard Perrotte, Stephane Perrotte, Quintal Montana Invest LLC, Pierre Thuillier, Thysolau LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Emails from Stephane Perrottes Declaration, #2 Exhibit Emails from Thierry Dutheils Declaration, #3 Exhibit Emails from Jean-Claude Jacquets Declaration, #4 Exhibit Emails from Pierre Thuilliers Declaration)(Schneider, McLain)
March 3, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #63 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Request for Oral Argument. Defendant's Reply Brief is due by 3/24/2017. (js)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting #68 Motion for additional extension of time to serve summons and complaint. (BG)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 (Text Only) ORDER Adopting #70 Stipulation filed by Big3 Property LLC by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Defendant's reply brief due by 3/24/17.(ZE)
March 2, 2017 Filing 70 STIPULATION [Joint] for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief re #63 Motion to Dismiss by Big3 Property LLC. (Raum, Michael) Modified on 3/3/2017 to add link (lh).
February 27, 2017 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM in Support re #68 MOTION for additional extension of time to serve summons and complaint filed by Berjo Montana LLC, Raymond Chabert, Jean-Yves Derault, Jean Pierre Dessaint, Thierry Dutheil, Eric Gabriel, Gabriel & Dessaint LLC, Jean-Claude Jacquet, Knet LLC, Luc-Oliver Laleve, Marcus LLC, PLTH Dakota, LLC, PLTH Montana, LLC, Jean-Louis Pepin, Ernard Perrotte, Stephane Perrotte, Quintal Montana Invest LLC, Pierre Thuillier, Thysolau LLC. (Schneider, McLain)
February 27, 2017 Filing 68 MOTION for additional extension of time to serve summons and complaint by Berjo Montana LLC, Raymond Chabert, Jean-Yves Derault, Jean Pierre Dessaint, Thierry Dutheil, Eric Gabriel, Gabriel & Dessaint LLC, Jean-Claude Jacquet, Knet LLC, Luc-Oliver Laleve, Marcus LLC, PLTH Dakota, LLC, PLTH Montana, LLC, Jean-Louis Pepin, Ernard Perrotte, Stephane Perrotte, Quintal Montana Invest LLC, Pierre Thuillier, Thysolau LLC. (Schneider, McLain)
February 24, 2017 Filing 67 RESPONSE to Motion re #63 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Request for Oral Argument filed by Berjo Montana LLC, Raymond Chabert, Jean-Yves Derault, Jean Pierre Dessaint, Thierry Dutheil, Eric Gabriel, Gabriel & Dessaint LLC, Jean-Claude Jacquet, Knet LLC, Luc-Oliver Laleve, Marcus LLC, PLTH Dakota, LLC, PLTH Montana, LLC, Jean-Louis Pepin, Ernard Perrotte, Stephane Perrotte, Quintal Montana Invest LLC, Pierre Thuillier, Thysolau LLC. (Attachments: #1 Booker Declaration 1/3, #2 Booker Declaration 2/3, #3 Booker Declaration 3/3, #4 Dutheil Declaration, #5 Jacquet Declaration, #6 Perrotte Declaration, #7 Thuillier Declaration)(Booker, James) Modified on 2/27/2017 to remove reference to 'Exhibit'. (rh)
February 6, 2017 Filing 66 MOTION for Hearing re #63 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Request for Oral Argument by Big3 Property LLC. (cjs)
February 3, 2017 Filing 65 AFFIDAVIT of Olivier Claeys (Second) re #63 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Request for Oral Argument by Big3 Property LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Website Archives)(Raum, Michael) Modified on 2/6/2017 to add exhibit letter(cjs).
February 3, 2017 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Support re #63 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Request for Oral Argument filed by Big3 Property LLC. (Raum, Michael)
February 3, 2017 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Request for Oral Argument by Big3 Property LLC. (Raum, Michael)
January 23, 2017 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #61 AMENDED COMPLAINT. Amended Complaint adds defendant JMI IMMO Invest LLC. Parties are not allowed to file documents that add a party and instead those documents should be sent to the clerk's office for filing. Clerk's office added party JMI IMMO Invest LLC and issued a summons as to the new defendant. (as)
January 23, 2017 Filing 62 Summons Issued as to JMI IMMO Invest LLC. (as) (Main Document 62 replaced on 2/23/2017 to remove overlapping header from the pleading) (lf).
January 20, 2017 Filing 61 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Pierre Thuillier, Thierry Dutheil, Luc-Oliver Laleve, Jean Pierre Dessaint, Berjo Montana LLC, Jean-Claude Jacquet, Raymond Chabert, Knet LLC, Thysolau LLC, Jean-Louis Pepin, Stephane Perrotte, Quintal Montana Invest LLC, PLTH Montana, LLC, Gabriel & Dessaint LLC, Eric Gabriel, PLTH Dakota, LLC, Ernard Perrotte, Marcus LLC, Jean-Yves Derault.(Schneider, McLain)
December 30, 2016 Filing 60 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Big3 Property LLC. (Alvine, Elizabeth)
December 30, 2016 Filing 59 AFFIDAVIT /Declaration of Oliver Claeys re #57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Request for Oral Argument by Big3 Property LLC. (Alvine, Elizabeth)
December 30, 2016 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM in Support re #57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Request for Oral Argument filed by Big3 Property LLC. (Alvine, Elizabeth)
December 30, 2016 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Request for Oral Argument by Big3 Property LLC. (Alvine, Elizabeth)
December 19, 2016 Filing 56 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pierre Thuillier, Thierry Dutheil, Luc-Oliver Laleve, Jean Pierre Dessaint, Berjo Montana LLC, Jean-Claude Jacquet, Raymond Chabert, Knet LLC, Thysolau LLC, Jean-Louis Pepin, Stephane Perrotte, Quintal Montana Invest LLC, PLTH Montana, LLC, Gabriel & Dessaint LLC, Eric Gabriel, PLTH Dakota, LLC, Ernard Perrotte, Marcus LLC, Jean-Yves Derault. VM Invest LLC served on 10/4/2016, answer due 10/25/2016 (Schneider, McLain)
December 19, 2016 Filing 55 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pierre Thuillier, Thierry Dutheil, Luc-Oliver Laleve, Jean Pierre Dessaint, Berjo Montana LLC, Jean-Claude Jacquet, Raymond Chabert, Knet LLC, Thysolau LLC, Jean-Louis Pepin, Stephane Perrotte, Quintal Montana Invest LLC, PLTH Montana, LLC, Gabriel & Dessaint LLC, Eric Gabriel, PLTH Dakota, LLC, Ernard Perrotte, Marcus LLC, Jean-Yves Derault. Big3 Property LLC served on 10/5/2016, answer due 10/26/2016 (Schneider, McLain)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting #52 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marty (ZE) Regenerated on 12/7/2016 (cjs).
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting #51 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Goplerud (ZE) Regenerated on 12/7/2016 (cjs).
December 5, 2016 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brian O. Marty (Filing fee $150, receipt number 117000215) by Berjo Montana LLC, Raymond Chabert, Jean-Yves Derault, Jean Pierre Dessaint, Thierry Dutheil, Eric Gabriel, Gabriel & Dessaint LLC, Jean-Claude Jacquet, Knet LLC, Luc-Oliver Laleve, Marcus LLC, PLTH Dakota, LLC, PLTH Montana, LLC, Jean-Louis Pepin, Ernard Perrotte, Stephane Perrotte, Quintal Montana Invest LLC, Pierre Thuillier, Thysolau LLC. (rh)
December 5, 2016 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney J. Barton Goplerud (Filing fee $150, receipt number 117000215) by Berjo Montana LLC, Raymond Chabert, Jean-Yves Derault, Jean Pierre Dessaint, Thierry Dutheil, Eric Gabriel, Gabriel & Dessaint LLC, Jean-Claude Jacquet, Knet LLC, Luc-Oliver Laleve, Marcus LLC, PLTH Dakota, LLC, PLTH Montana, LLC, Jean-Louis Pepin, Ernard Perrotte, Stephane Perrotte, Quintal Montana Invest LLC, Pierre Thuillier, Thysolau LLC. (rh)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting #48 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alan L. Rosca (ZE)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting #47 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James P. Booker (ZE)
September 28, 2016 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Alan A. Rosca (Filing fee $150, receipt number 116001476) by Berjo Montana LLC, Raymond Chabert, Jean-Yves Derault, Jean Pierre Dessaint, Thierry Dutheil, Eric Gabriel, Gabriel & Dessaint LLC, Jean-Claude Jacquet, Knet LLC, Luc-Oliver Laleve, Marcus LLC, PLTH Dakota, LLC, PLTH Montana, LLC, Jean-Louis Pepin, Ernard Perrotte, Stephane Perrotte, Quintal Montana Invest LLC, Pierre Thuillier, Thysolau LLC. (rh)
September 28, 2016 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney James P. Booker (Filing fee $150, receipt number 116001475) by Berjo Montana LLC, Raymond Chabert, Jean-Yves Derault, Jean Pierre Dessaint, Thierry Dutheil, Eric Gabriel, Gabriel & Dessaint LLC, Jean-Claude Jacquet, Knet LLC, Luc-Oliver Laleve, Marcus LLC, PLTH Dakota, LLC, PLTH Montana, LLC, Jean-Louis Pepin, Ernard Perrotte, Stephane Perrotte, Quintal Montana Invest LLC, Pierre Thuillier, Thysolau LLC. (rh)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting in part #44 Motion Extension of Time to Serve Summons and Complaint. Plaintiffs shall have 160 days from the date of this order to serve Defendant Michael Bujaldon. (rh)
September 16, 2016 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM in Support re #44 MOTION Extension of Time to Serve Summons and Complaint upon Defendant Michael Bujaldon filed by Berjo Montana LLC, Raymond Chabert, Jean-Yves Derault, Jean Pierre Dessaint, Thierry Dutheil, Eric Gabriel, Gabriel & Dessaint LLC, Jean-Claude Jacquet, Knet LLC, Luc-Oliver Laleve, Marcus LLC, PLTH Dakota, LLC, PLTH Montana, LLC, Jean-Louis Pepin, Ernard Perrotte, Stephane Perrotte, Quintal Montana Invest LLC, Pierre Thuillier, Thysolau LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Schneider, McLain)
September 16, 2016 Filing 44 MOTION Extension of Time to Serve Summons and Complaint upon Defendant Michael Bujaldon by Berjo Montana LLC, Raymond Chabert, Jean-Yves Derault, Jean Pierre Dessaint, Thierry Dutheil, Eric Gabriel, Gabriel & Dessaint LLC, Jean-Claude Jacquet, Knet LLC, Luc-Oliver Laleve, Marcus LLC, PLTH Dakota, LLC, PLTH Montana, LLC, Jean-Louis Pepin, Ernard Perrotte, Stephane Perrotte, Quintal Montana Invest LLC, Pierre Thuillier, Thysolau LLC. (Schneider, McLain)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel L. Hovland and Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr no longer the presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Ralph R. Erickson.(rh)
August 30, 2016 Filing 42 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Berjo Montana LLC, Raymond Chabert, Jean Pierre Dessaint, Thierry Dutheil, Eric Gabriel, Gabriel & Dessaint LLC, Jean-Claude Jacquet, Knet LLC, Luc-Oliver Laleve, Marcus LLC, PLTH Dakota, LLC, PLTH Montana, LLC, Jean-Louis Pepin, Ernard Perrotte, Stephane Perrotte, Quintal Montana Invest LLC, Pierre Thuillier, Thysolau LLC. (rh)
August 30, 2016 Filing 41 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to PLTH Montana, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/6/2016. (rh)
August 30, 2016 Filing 40 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to PLTH Dakota, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/6/2016. (rh)
August 30, 2016 Filing 39 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Pierre Thuillier. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/6/2016. (rh)
August 30, 2016 Filing 38 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Knet LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/6/2016. (rh)
August 30, 2016 Filing 37 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Stephane Perrotte. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/6/2016. (rh)
August 30, 2016 Filing 36 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Berjo Montana LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/6/2016. (rh)
August 30, 2016 Filing 35 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Ernard Perrotte. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/6/2016. (rh)
August 30, 2016 Filing 34 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jean-Louis Pepin. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/6/2016. (rh)
August 30, 2016 Filing 33 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Luc-Oliver Laleve. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/6/2016. (rh)
August 30, 2016 Filing 32 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Marcus LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/6/2016. (rh)
August 30, 2016 Filing 31 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jean-Claude Jacquet. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/6/2016. (rh)
August 30, 2016 Filing 30 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Eric Gabriel. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/6/2016. (rh)
August 30, 2016 Filing 29 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Thysolau LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/6/2016. (rh)
August 30, 2016 Filing 28 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Thierry Dutheil. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/6/2016. (rh)
August 30, 2016 Filing 27 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Gabriel & Dessaint LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/6/2016. (rh)
August 30, 2016 Filing 26 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jean Pierre Dessaint. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/6/2016. (rh)
August 30, 2016 Filing 25 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jean-Yves Derault. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/6/2016. (rh)
August 30, 2016 Filing 24 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Quintal Montana Invest LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/6/2016. (rh)
August 30, 2016 Filing 23 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Raymond Chabert. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/6/2016. (rh)
August 10, 2016 Filing 22 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Thysolau LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/24/2016. (lf)
August 10, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Pierre Thuillier. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/24/2016. (lf)
August 10, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE by Berjo Montana LLC, Raymond Chabert, Jean-Yves Derault, Jean Pierre Dessaint, Thierry Dutheil, Eric Gabriel, Gabriel & Dessaint LLC, Jean-Claude Jacquet, Knet LLC, Luc-Oliver Laleve, Marcus LLC, PLTH Dakota, LLC, PLTH Montana, LLC, Jean-Louis Pepin, Ernard Perrotte, Stephane Perrotte, Quintal Montana Invest LLC, Pierre Thuillier, Thysolau LLC Notice of Related Case (Schneider, McLain)
August 10, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Quintal Montana Invest LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/24/2016. (lf)
August 10, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Stephane Perrotte. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/24/2016. (lf)
August 10, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Ernard Perrotte. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/24/2016. (lf)
August 10, 2016 Filing 16 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jean-Louis Pepin. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/24/2016. (lf)
August 10, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to PLTH Montana, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/24/2016. (lf)
August 10, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to PLTH Dakota, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/24/2016. (lf)
August 10, 2016 Filing 13 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Marcus LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/24/2016. (lf)
August 10, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Luc-Oliver Laleve. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/24/2016. (lf)
August 10, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Knet LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/24/2016. (lf)
August 10, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jean-Claude Jacquet. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/24/2016. (lf)
August 10, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Gabriel & Dessaint LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/24/2016. (lf)
August 10, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Eric Gabriel. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/24/2016. (lf)
August 10, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Thierry Dutheil. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/24/2016. (lf)
August 10, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jean Pierre Dessaint. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/24/2016. (lf)
August 10, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jean-Yves Derault. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/24/2016. (lf)
August 10, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Raymond Chabert. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/24/2016. (lf)
August 10, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Berjo Montana LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/24/2016. (lf)
August 10, 2016 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Big3 Property LLC, Michael Francois Bujaldon, VM Invest LLC. (lf)
August 10, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Big3 Property LLC, Michael Francois Bujaldon, VM Invest LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 316000491) filed by Pierre Thuillier, Thierry Dutheil, Luc-Oliver Laleve, Jean Pierre Dessaint, Berjo Montana LLC, Jean-Claude Jacquet, Raymond Chabert, Knet LLC, Thysolau LLC, Jean-Louis Pepin, Stephane Perrotte, Quintal Montana Invest LLC, PLTH Montana, LLC, Gabriel & Dessaint LLC, Eric Gabriel, PLTH Dakota, LLC, Ernard Perrotte, Marcus LLC, Jean-Yves Derault. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chabert et al v. Bujaldon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chabert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephane Perrotte
Represented By: Alan L. Rosca
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Represented By: Brian O. Marty
Represented By: James P. Booker
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Pierre Dessaint
Represented By: Alan L. Rosca
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Represented By: Brian O. Marty
Represented By: James P. Booker
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knet LLC
Represented By: Alan L. Rosca
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Represented By: Brian O. Marty
Represented By: James P. Booker
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thysolau LLC
Represented By: Alan L. Rosca
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Represented By: Brian O. Marty
Represented By: James P. Booker
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Chabert
Represented By: Alan L. Rosca
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Represented By: Brian O. Marty
Represented By: James P. Booker
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus LLC
Represented By: Alan L. Rosca
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Represented By: Brian O. Marty
Represented By: James P. Booker
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean-Claude Jacquet
Represented By: Alan L. Rosca
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Represented By: Brian O. Marty
Represented By: James P. Booker
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PLTH Montana, LLC
Represented By: Alan L. Rosca
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Represented By: Brian O. Marty
Represented By: James P. Booker
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luc-Oliver Laleve
Represented By: Alan L. Rosca
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Represented By: Brian O. Marty
Represented By: James P. Booker
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quintal Montana Invest LLC
Represented By: Alan L. Rosca
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Represented By: Brian O. Marty
Represented By: James P. Booker
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernard Perrotte
Represented By: Alan L. Rosca
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Represented By: Brian O. Marty
Represented By: James P. Booker
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel & Dessaint LLC
Represented By: Alan L. Rosca
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Represented By: Brian O. Marty
Represented By: James P. Booker
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thierry Dutheil
Represented By: Alan L. Rosca
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Represented By: Brian O. Marty
Represented By: James P. Booker
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PLTH Dakota, LLC
Represented By: Alan L. Rosca
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Represented By: Brian O. Marty
Represented By: James P. Booker
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierre Thuillier
Represented By: Alan L. Rosca
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Represented By: Brian O. Marty
Represented By: James P. Booker
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean-Yves Derault
Represented By: Alan L. Rosca
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Represented By: Brian O. Marty
Represented By: James P. Booker
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berjo Montana LLC
Represented By: Alan L. Rosca
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Represented By: Brian O. Marty
Represented By: James P. Booker
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Gabriel
Represented By: Alan L. Rosca
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Represented By: Brian O. Marty
Represented By: James P. Booker
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean-Louis Pepin
Represented By: Alan L. Rosca
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Represented By: Brian O. Marty
Represented By: James P. Booker
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bujaldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Francois Bujaldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big3 Property LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Alvine
Represented By: Michael S. Raum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VM Invest LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JMI IMMO Invest LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?