MBI Energy Services v. Hoch et al
Plaintiff: MBI Energy Services
Defendant: Robert Hoch, Charles Kannebecker and Law Office of Charles Kannebecker, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv00329
Filed: September 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Stark
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying 30 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 36 Motion to Dismiss; granting 25 Motion for Summary Judgment (NH)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr denying 42 Motion to Strike ; denying 44 Motion for Leave to File (ZE)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2017 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jodi Runger (ZE) Regenerated to Attorneys J. Matthew Stephens and Jodi Bishop Runger on 11/1/2016. (rh)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Charles Kannebecker. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MBI Energy Services v. Hoch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MBI Energy Services
Represented By: John Gordon Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hoch
Represented By: Charles Kannebecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Kannebecker
Represented By: Charles Kannebecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of Charles Kannebecker, LLC
Represented By: Charles Kannebecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?