Pitchblack Oil, LLC v. Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pitchblack Oil, LLC
Defendant: Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC and Hess Corporation
Case Number: 1:2016cv00349
Filed: September 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Dunn
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying 34 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 41 Motion for Summary Judgment (NH)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER adopting 56 Stipulation To Vacate Scheduling Order and Stay Discovery. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2018 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/3/2017 at 10:00 AM CDT by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(ZE)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Adopting Stipulation 8 filed by Pitchblack Oil, LLC by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(ZE)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitchblack Oil, LLC v. Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pitchblack Oil, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence Bender
Represented By: Michael D. Schoepf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: Chris LeCates
Represented By: John W. Morrison, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Corporation
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: Chris LeCates
Represented By: John W. Morrison, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?