Biwer et al v. Pecan Pipeline (North Dakota), Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Neal Biwer and Cherlyn Biwer
Defendant: Pecan Pipeline (North Dakota), Inc. and EOG Resources, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00378
Filed: October 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Mountrail
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/10/2019 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 38 MOTION to Continue Trial; MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/1/2019. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 4/30/2019. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 6/30/2019. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 7/30/2019. Discover depositions of expert witnesses due by 9/15/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2019. Final Pretrial Conference REset for 2/12/2020 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate J udge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Previously set for 9/11/2019). Jury Trial REset for 2/24/2020 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (5 days) (Previously set for 9/23/2019). By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER amending pretrial deadlines. Amended Pleadings due by 8/31/2018. Discovery due by 10/31/2018. Discovery Motions due by 11/30/2018. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 10/31/2018. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 11/30/2018. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 12/14/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 8/31/2018. Other Nondispositive Motions due by 8/31/2018. Threshold Motions due by 8/1/2018. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) (Main Document 30 replaced on 5/14/2018 per Chambers' request due to typing error. NEF regenerated to all parties.) (cd)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2019. Final Pretrial Conference REset for 9/11/2019 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Previously set for 1/8/2019). Jury Trial REset for 9/23/2019 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland (5 days) (Previously set for 1/22/2019). By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(BG)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED ORDER: Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2018. Final Pretrial Conference REset for 1/8/2019 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Jury Trial REset for 1/22/2019 at 9:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (amended to correct trial judge) (BG)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Staying Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (ZE)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2018 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(ZE)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2017 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biwer et al v. Pecan Pipeline (North Dakota), Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neal Biwer
Represented By: Derrick L. Braaten
Represented By: David C. Keagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherlyn Biwer
Represented By: Derrick L. Braaten
Represented By: David C. Keagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pecan Pipeline (North Dakota), Inc.
Represented By: Larry L. Boschee
Represented By: Charles M. Carvell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EOG Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Larry L. Boschee
Represented By: Charles M. Carvell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?