Workforce Housing, LLC v. Weatherford U.S., L.P.
Plaintiff: Workforce Housing, LLC
Defendant: Weatherford U.S., L.P.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00397
Filed: November 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Williams
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER adopting 33 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 31 Motion to Stay. (BG)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2018 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2017 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Arthur E. Anthony; granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Taylor F. Brinkman. (BG) Regenerated NEF to Attorneys Anthony and Brinkman on 12/8/2016. (rh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Workforce Housing, LLC v. Weatherford U.S., L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Workforce Housing, LLC
Represented By: Arthur E. Anthony
Represented By: Taylor F. Brinkman
Represented By: Patrick W. Durick
Represented By: Kirsten H. Tuntland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weatherford U.S., L.P.
Represented By: Trevor A. Hunter
Represented By: Kent A. Reierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?