Continental Resources, Inc. v. North Dakota Board of University and School Lands et al
Plaintiff: Continental Resources, Inc.
Defendant: North Dakota Board of University and School Lands and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2017cv00014
Filed: January 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: McKenzie
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Re: Briefing Schedule by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/7/2020 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER adopting proposed case schedule by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Land Board's pleadings setting forth its claim to the stake are due by 6/14/2019. The United States shall assert its claims, if any, consistent with the Court's previous order by 8/13/2019. This matter shall be stayed following the United States' 8/13/2019 filing. The parties shall submit a status report by 9/19/2019. A status conference is set for 9/20/2019 before the Magistrate Judge.(BG)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 54 MOTION for Scheduling Conference. The stay is lifted and a Scheduling Conference is set for 3/18/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 51 Motion to Stay ACTION DUE TO LAPSE OF APPROPRIATIONS. (BG)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re submission of revised scheduling plan and for scheduling conference. Scheduling conference set for 1/24/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) (Main Document 50 replaced on 1/4/2019 to correct date in order) (cjs). Regenerated on 1/4/2019 (cjs).
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/22/2017 at 10:00 AM CST by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Chambers will initiate the conference call. (ZE)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. finding as moot 15 Motion to Cancel Deadline; granting 16 Motion for Status Conference. (BG)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul R.Q. Wolfson; granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nathaniel B. Custer; granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David W. Ogden. (BG) NEF regenerated on 2/24/2017 to Attorney Ogden, Attorney Wolfson, and Attorney Custer (cjs).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Continental Resources, Inc. v. North Dakota Board of University and School Lands et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Bender
Represented By: Danielle M. Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Dakota Board of University and School Lands
Represented By: Hope L. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Shaun M. Pettigrew
Represented By: Kent Rockstad(Designation USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?