Estvold Oilfield Services, Inc. v. The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Estvold Oilfield Services, Inc.
Defendant: The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc. and PayneWest Insurance, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00016
Filed: January 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Western Office
County: Mountrail
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER adopting 109 Stipulation of Dismissal. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER: This case shall be held abeyance pending further order of the court. The final pretrial conference set for 9/12/2018 and trial set for 9/24/2018 are cancelled with the understanding that they shall be rescheduled as necessary at a later date and time. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 53 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting 58 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 74 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (BG)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 34 Motion for Hearing. (BG)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/16/2017 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller Jr. by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(ZE)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estvold Oilfield Services, Inc. v. The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estvold Oilfield Services, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Hagel
Represented By: Briana L. Hildebrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PayneWest Insurance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?